IN HB1060 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Passed on April 24 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-24 - Public Law 76
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Passed on April 24 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-24 - Public Law 76
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
School corporation operations fund levy. Provides for an increase in the maximum permissible operations fund levy for the North Spencer County School Corporation.
Title
School corporation operations fund levy. Provides for an increase in the maximum permissible operations fund levy for the North Spencer County School Corporation.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-03-19 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-03-12 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-15 - House - Third reading (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-01-09 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-03-12 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-15 - House - Third reading (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-01-09 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-24 | House | Public Law 76 |
2019-04-24 | House | Signed by the Governor |
2019-04-23 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2019-03-28 | Senate | Signed by the President Pro Tempore |
2019-03-28 | House | Signed by the Speaker |
2019-03-20 | Senate | Returned to the House without amendments |
2019-03-19 | Senate | Senator Buchanan added as second sponsor |
2019-03-19 | Senate | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 281: yeas 48, nays 0 |
2019-03-18 | Senate | Second reading: ordered engrossed |
2019-03-14 | Senate | Committee report: do pass, adopted |
2019-02-27 | Senate | First reading: referred to Committee on Appropriations |
2019-01-16 | House | Referred to the Senate |
2019-01-15 | House | Senate sponsor: Senator Messmer |
2019-01-15 | House | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 9: yeas 96, nays 0 |
2019-01-14 | House | Amendment #1 (Bauer) failed; voice vote |
2019-01-14 | House | Second reading: ordered engrossed |
2019-01-10 | House | Committee report: do pass, adopted |
2019-01-03 | House | First reading: referred to Committee on Ways and Means |
2019-01-03 | House | Coauthored by Representative Bacon |
2019-01-03 | House | Authored by Representative Bartels |