IN HB1051 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on April 10 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-10 - Public Law 23
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on April 10 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-10 - Public Law 23
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Study of reckless homicide. Urges the legislative council to assign the task of studying the topic of reckless homicide to an appropriate study committee.
Title
Study of reckless homicide. Urges the legislative council to assign the task of studying the topic of reckless homicide to an appropriate study committee.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-03-18 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-03-12 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-05 - House - Third reading (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-01-30 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-03-12 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-05 - House - Third reading (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-01-30 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-10 | House | Public Law 23 |
2019-04-10 | House | Signed by the Governor |
2019-04-09 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2019-04-02 | Senate | Signed by the President Pro Tempore |
2019-03-28 | House | Signed by the Speaker |
2019-03-19 | Senate | Returned to the House without amendments |
2019-03-18 | Senate | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 268: yeas 46, nays 0 |
2019-03-14 | Senate | Second reading: ordered engrossed |
2019-03-12 | Senate | Committee report: do pass, adopted |
2019-02-27 | Senate | First reading: referred to Committee on Corrections and Criminal Law |
2019-02-06 | House | Referred to the Senate |
2019-02-05 | House | Senate sponsors: Senators Young M and Tallian |
2019-02-05 | House | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 96: yeas 95, nays 0 |
2019-02-04 | House | Second reading: ordered engrossed |
2019-01-31 | House | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted |
2019-01-03 | House | First reading: referred to Committee on Courts and Criminal Code |
2019-01-03 | House | Authored by Representative Thompson |