IN HB1040 | 2016 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 5-2)
Status: Passed on March 24 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-24 - Public Law 194
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Food and beverage tax. Provides that, subject to the duty to pay amounts pledged to the repayment of existing obligations, the existing uses of the Henry County food and beverage tax are optional rather than mandatory. Adds the construction, renovation, improvement, or repair of county roads to the list of capital improvements for which Henry County is authorized to use county food and beverage tax revenues. Removes obsolete provisions concerning the existing county capital improvements committee, which is abolished by current law on January 1, 2016. Establishes a county food and beverage tax advisory committee to make recommendations to the

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Food and beverage tax. Provides that, subject to the duty to pay amounts pledged to the repayment of existing obligations, the existing uses of the Henry County food and beverage tax are optional rather than mandatory. Adds the construction, renovation, improvement, or repair of county roads to the list of capital improvements for which Henry County is authorized to use county food and beverage tax revenues. Removes obsolete provisions concerning the existing county capital improvements committee, which is abolished by current law on January 1, 2016. Establishes a county food and beverage tax advisory committee to make recommendations to the

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2016-03-03 - House - House - House concurred in Senate amendments (Y: 92 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2016-03-01 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 36 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-23 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-01-25 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 92 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2016-01-19 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 10 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2016-03-24HousePublic Law 194
2016-03-24HouseSigned by the Governor
2016-03-17SenateSigned by the President of the Senate
2016-03-10SenateSigned by the President Pro Tempore
2016-03-09HouseSigned by the Speaker
2016-03-03HouseMotion to concur filed
2016-03-03HouseHouse concurred in Senate amendments; Roll Call 351: yeas 92, nays 0
2016-03-02SenateReturned to the House with amendments
2016-03-01SenateSenator Raatz added as cosponsor
2016-03-01SenateThird reading: passed; Roll Call 249: yeas 36, nays 14
2016-02-29SenateSenator Broden added as cosponsor
2016-02-25SenateSecond reading: ordered engrossed
2016-02-23SenateSenator Leising added as second sponsor
2016-02-23SenateCommittee report: amend do pass, adopted
2016-02-03SenateFirst reading: referred to Committee on Tax & Fiscal Policy
2016-01-26HouseReferred to the Senate
2016-01-25HouseRepresentatives Smaltz and GiaQuinta added as coauthors
2016-01-25HouseSenate sponsor: Senator Kruse
2016-01-25HouseThird reading: passed; Roll Call 44: yeas 93, nays 0
2016-01-21HouseSecond reading: ordered engrossed
2016-01-19HouseCommittee report: do pass, adopted
2016-01-05HouseFirst reading: referred to Committee on Government and Regulatory Reform
2016-01-05HouseAuthored by Representative Cox

Indiana State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://iga.in.gov/legislative/2016/bills/house/1040/
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/b/6/d/e/b6de8ad7/HB1040.01.INTR.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/b/a/a/9/baa94ab0/HB1040.01.INTR.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/4/9/9/7/49976e43/HB1040.02.COMH.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/7/1/8/b/718b2aac/HB1040.02.COMH.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/e/2/0/9/e209a6bf/HB1040.03.COMS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/5/e/f/b/5efb792c/HB1040.03.COMS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/7/8/1/b/781bb58b/HB1040.04.ENRS.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/e/a/2/3/ea23ec02/HB1040.01.INTR.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/3/d/0/2/3d02191b/HB1040.44.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/9/6/6/a/966ad7b5/HB1040.02.COMH.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/f/8/7/d/f87d9a7c/HB1040.249.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/d/c/3/5/dc358c1b/HB1040.351.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback