IN HB1040 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Engrossed on February 20 2013 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-03-25 - Senator Zakas added as cosponsor
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 20 2013 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-03-25 - Senator Zakas added as cosponsor
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Child in need of services petitions.
Title
Child in need of services petitions.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-02-20 - House - House - Third reading: passed (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-03-25 | Senate | Senator Zakas added as cosponsor |
2013-02-27 | Senate | First reading: referred to Committee on Judiciary |
2013-02-20 | House | Senate sponsors: Senators Yoder and Holdman |
2013-02-20 | House | Referred to the Senate |
2013-02-20 | House | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 184: yeas 96, nays 0 |
2013-02-19 | House | Amendment 1 (Mahan), prevailed; voice vote |
2013-02-19 | House | Second reading: amended, ordered engrossed |
2013-02-14 | House | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted |
2013-02-07 | House | Representative C. Brown added as coauthor |
2013-01-07 | House | First reading: referred to Committee on Family, Children and Human Affairs |
2013-01-07 | House | Coauthored by Representatives Mahan and Riecken |
2013-01-07 | House | Authored by Representative Kubacki |