IN HB1040 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 25 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-03-25 - Effective 06/01/2010
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 25 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-03-25 - Effective 06/01/2010
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Extends the final report date and expiration date of the lake management work group from July 1, 2010, to July 1, 2011.
Title
Lake management work group.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-03-25 | Effective 06/01/2010 | |
2010-03-25 | Public Law 59 | |
2010-03-17 | Signed by the Governor | |
2010-03-11 | Signed by the President of the Senate | |
2010-03-10 | Signed by the President Pro Tempore | |
2010-03-08 | Signed by the Speaker | |
2010-03-01 | House concurred in Senate amendments; Roll Call 263: Yeas 91, Nays 0 | |
2010-02-25 | Returned to the House with amendments | |
2010-02-25 | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 227: Yeas 50 and Nays 0 | |
2010-02-24 | Amendment 1 (Buck), failed; Voice Vote | |
2010-02-24 | Second reading: ordered engrossed | |
2010-02-16 | Senator Rogers added as cosponsor | |
2010-02-16 | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted | |
2010-02-08 | First reading: referred to Committee on Natural Resources | |
2010-02-02 | Senate sponsors: Senators Stutzman and Arnold | |
2010-02-02 | Referred to the Senate | |
2010-02-02 | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 158: Yeas 98, Nays 0 | |
2010-02-01 | Second reading: ordered engrossed | |
2010-01-28 | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted | |
2010-01-12 | Representative Dodge added as coauthor | |
2010-01-05 | First reading: referred to Committee on Natural Resources | |
2010-01-05 | Authored by Representative Dembowski |