IN HB1025 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 19 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-19 - Public Law 83
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 19 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-19 - Public Law 83
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Enterprise zone renewals. Provides that an enterprise zone may be renewed for an additional five year period if the fiscal body of the municipality in which the enterprise zone is located adopts a resolution to renew the enterprise zone. Provides that a zone business located in the renewed enterprise zone may only access the property tax deduction incentive.
Title
Enterprise zone renewals.
Sponsors
Rep. Jim Pressel [R] | Rep. Michael Karickhoff [R] | Rep. Mike Andrade [D] | Sen. Mike Bohacek [R] |
Sen. Fady Qaddoura [D] | Sen. David Niezgodski [D] | Sen. Lonnie Randolph [D] |
Roll Calls
2021-04-05 - Senate - Senate Floor - (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-03-30 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-18 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-02-08 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 94 N: 2 NV: 2 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-02-02 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 10 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-03-30 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-18 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-02-08 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 94 N: 2 NV: 2 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-02-02 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 10 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-19 | House | Public Law 83 |
2021-04-19 | House | Signed by the Governor |
2021-04-19 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2021-04-08 | Senate | Signed by the President Pro Tempore |
2021-04-07 | House | Signed by the Speaker |
2021-04-06 | Senate | Returned to the House without amendments |
2021-04-05 | Senate | Senator Randolph added as cosponsor |
2021-04-05 | Senate | Senator Qaddoura added as second sponsor |
2021-04-05 | Senate | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 336: yeas 48, nays 0 |
2021-04-01 | Senate | Second reading: ordered engrossed |
2021-03-30 | Senate | Senator Niezgodski added as cosponsor |
2021-03-30 | Senate | Committee report: do pass, adopted |
2021-03-18 | Senate | Committee report: do pass adopted; reassigned to Committee on Tax and Fiscal Policy |
2021-02-23 | Senate | First reading: referred to Committee on Commerce and Technology |
2021-02-09 | House | Referred to the Senate |
2021-02-08 | House | Senate sponsor: Senator Bohacek |
2021-02-08 | House | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 83: yeas 94, nays 2 |
2021-02-04 | House | Representative Andrade M added as coauthor |
2021-02-04 | House | Second reading: ordered engrossed |
2021-02-02 | House | Committee report: do pass, adopted |
2021-01-04 | House | First reading: referred to Committee on Commerce, Small Business and Economic Development |
2021-01-04 | House | Coauthored by Representative Karickhoff |
2021-01-04 | House | Authored by Representative Pressel |