IN HB1019 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 5-2)
Status: Passed on April 18 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-18 - Public Law 43
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 5-2)
Status: Passed on April 18 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-18 - Public Law 43
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Public construction. Increases, from $100,000 to $150,000, the ceiling under which a board of aviation commissioners or an airport authority board may perform certain public construction projects with its own workforce. Increases, from $75,000 to $150,000 the ceiling under which a county drainage board may obtain quotes rather than advertise for bids for certain projects under the drainage law.
Title
Public construction. Increases, from $100,000 to $150,000, the ceiling under which a board of aviation commissioners or an airport authority board may perform certain public construction projects with its own workforce. Increases, from $75,000 to $150,000 the ceiling under which a county drainage board may obtain quotes rather than advertise for bids for certain projects under the drainage law.
Sponsors
Rep. Jim Pressel [R] | Rep. Karen Engleman [R] | Rep. Vernon Smith [D] | Rep. Michael Karickhoff [R] |
Sen. Mike Bohacek [R] | Sen. Brian Buchanan [R] | Sen. Lonnie Randolph [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-03-18 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 43 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-03-07 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-01-22 - House - Third reading (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-10 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-03-07 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-01-22 - House - Third reading (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-10 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-18 | House | Public Law 43 |
2019-04-18 | House | Signed by the Governor |
2019-04-17 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2019-04-02 | Senate | Signed by the President Pro Tempore |
2019-03-28 | House | Signed by the Speaker |
2019-03-19 | Senate | Returned to the House without amendments |
2019-03-18 | Senate | Senator Randolph added as cosponsor |
2019-03-18 | Senate | Senator Buchanan added as second sponsor |
2019-03-18 | Senate | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 267: yeas 43, nays 2 |
2019-03-14 | Senate | Second reading: ordered engrossed |
2019-03-11 | Senate | Committee report: do pass, adopted |
2019-02-27 | Senate | First reading: referred to Committee on Local Government |
2019-01-24 | House | Referred to the Senate |
2019-01-22 | House | Representative Karickhoff added as coauthor |
2019-01-22 | House | Senate sponsor: Senator Bohacek |
2019-01-22 | House | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 19: yeas 98, nays 0 |
2019-01-17 | House | Representatives Engleman and Smith, V. added as coauthors |
2019-01-17 | House | Second reading: ordered engrossed |
2019-01-14 | House | Committee report: do pass, adopted |
2019-01-03 | House | First reading: referred to Committee on Local Government |
2019-01-03 | House | Authored by Representative Pressel |