IN HB1013 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on January 26 2015 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-02-24 - First Reading: Referred to committee on Commerce & Technology
Pending: Senate Commerce & Technology Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on January 26 2015 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-02-24 - First Reading: Referred to committee on Commerce & Technology
Pending: Senate Commerce & Technology Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Publication of notice by political subdivisions. Provides that in certain circumstances, a political subdivision (other than a county) may publish notice in a locality newspaper that circulates in the political subdivision instead of in a newspaper that is published in the county and circulates in the political subdivision. Establishes requirements for locality newspapers that may publish notice.
Title
Publication of notice by political subdivisions. Provides that in certain circumstances, a political subdivision (other than a county) may publish notice in a locality newspaper that circulates in the political subdivision instead of in a newspaper that is published in the county and circulates in the political subdivision. Establishes requirements for locality newspapers that may publish notice.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-01-26 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 88 N: 8 NV: 2 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-01-20 - House - House Committee on Government and Regulatory Reform - Committee Vote (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2015-01-20 - House - House Committee on Government and Regulatory Reform - Committee Vote (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-02-24 | Senate | First Reading: Referred to committee on Commerce & Technology |
2015-01-27 | House | Senator Merritt added first sponsor |
2015-01-26 | House | Referred to the Senate |
2015-01-26 | House | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 20: yeas 88, nays 8 |
2015-01-22 | House | Second reading: ordered engrossed |
2015-01-20 | House | Committee report: do pass, adopted |
2015-01-06 | House | First Reading: referred to Committee on Government and Regulatory Reform |
2015-01-06 | House | Authored by Representative Torr |