IN HB1008 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Engrossed on February 17 2011 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-03-08 - Committee report: amend do pass, reassigned to Committee on Tax and Fiscal Policy
Pending: Senate Tax and Fiscal Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 17 2011 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-03-08 - Committee report: amend do pass, reassigned to Committee on Tax and Fiscal Policy
Pending: Senate Tax and Fiscal Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Increases the maximum amount of tax credits available under the venture capital investment tax credit for the provision of qualified investment capital to a particular qualified Indiana business from $500,000 to $1,000,000 for calendar years after 2010. Requires investments eligible for the venture capital investment tax credit to be made before January 1, 2015, instead of January 1, 2013. Suspends, beginning July 1, 2011, and ending June 30, 2013, the application fee allowed in current law for applicants seeking certification for the venture capital investment tax credit.
Title
Venture capital investment tax credit.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-02-17 - House - House - Third reading: passed (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2011-02-15 - House - House - Amendment 1 (Crawford), prevailed (Y: 60 N: 34 NV: 3 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2011-02-15 - House - House - Amendment 1 (Crawford), prevailed (Y: 60 N: 34 NV: 3 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-03-08 | Committee report: amend do pass, reassigned to Committee on Tax and Fiscal Policy | |
2011-02-21 | First reading: referred to Committee on Commerce & Economic Development | |
2011-02-17 | Senate sponsors: Senators Hershman, Kenley and Arnold | |
2011-02-17 | Referred to the Senate | |
2011-02-17 | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 197: yeas 96, nays 0 | |
2011-02-15 | Amendment 1 (Crawford), prevailed; Roll Call 156: yeas 60, nays 34 | |
2011-02-15 | Second reading: amended, ordered engrossed | |
2011-02-10 | Committee report: do pass, adopted | |
2011-01-27 | Referred to Committee on Ways and Means pursuant to House Rule 127 | |
2011-01-24 | Representative Welch added as coauthor | |
2011-01-24 | Committee report: do pass, adopted | |
2011-01-12 | First reading: referred to Committee on Commerce, Small Business and Economic Development | |
2011-01-12 | Coauthored by Representatives Heuer and Kubacki | |
2011-01-12 | Authored by Representative Torr |