IN HB1005 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 8-2)
Status: Engrossed on February 19 2015 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-03-12 - Committee report: do pass adopted; reassigned to Committee on Tax & Fiscal Policy
Pending: Senate Tax and Fiscal Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 19 2015 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-03-12 - Committee report: do pass adopted; reassigned to Committee on Tax & Fiscal Policy
Pending: Senate Tax and Fiscal Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Tax credit for teachers' classroom supplies. Provides that an individual employed as a teacher is entitled to a credit against the individual's adjusted gross income tax liability for amounts expended on classroom supplies up to a maximum of $200 per taxable year.
Title
Tax credit for teachers' classroom supplies. Provides that an individual employed as a teacher is entitled to a credit against the individual's adjusted gross income tax liability for amounts expended on classroom supplies up to a maximum of $200 per taxable year.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-03-11 - Senate - Senate Committee on Education & Career Development - Committee Vote (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-17 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2015-02-16 - House - House - Amendment #1 (Porter) failed (Y: 27 N: 69 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [FAIL]
2015-02-11 - House - House Committee on Ways and Means - Committee Vote (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2015-01-27 - House - House Committee on Education - Committee Vote (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-02-17 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2015-02-16 - House - House - Amendment #1 (Porter) failed (Y: 27 N: 69 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [FAIL]
2015-02-11 - House - House Committee on Ways and Means - Committee Vote (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2015-01-27 - House - House Committee on Education - Committee Vote (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-12 | Senate | Committee report: do pass adopted; reassigned to Committee on Tax & Fiscal Policy |
2015-03-09 | Senate | Senators Leising and Brown L added as cosponsor |
2015-03-03 | Senate | Senator Rogers added as cosponsor |
2015-02-24 | Senate | First Reading: Referred to Committee on Education & Career Development |
2015-02-19 | House | Referred to the Senate |
2015-02-17 | House | Senator Kruse added as third sponsor |
2015-02-17 | House | Senator Crider added as second sponsor |
2015-02-17 | House | Senator Banks A added as sponsor |
2015-02-17 | House | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 155: yeas 94, nays 0 |
2015-02-16 | House | Amendment #1 (Porter) failed; Roll Call 140: yeas 27, nays 69 |
2015-02-16 | House | Second reading: ordered engrossed |
2015-02-12 | House | Committee report: do pass, adopted |
2015-01-27 | House | Representative Moed added as coauthor |
2015-01-27 | House | Committee report: do pass, adopted |
2015-01-27 | House | Referred to Committee on Ways and Means pursuant to House Rule 127 |
2015-01-15 | House | First Reading: referred to Committee on Education |
2015-01-15 | House | Coauthored by Representatives Ubelhor and Carbaugh |
2015-01-15 | House | Authored by Representative Smaltz |