IN HB1005 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 45-11)
Status: Enrolled on February 27 2012 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-03-19 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Status: Enrolled on February 27 2012 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-03-19 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Specifies that the following are not lucrative offices: (1) Notary public. (2) Membership on a board administered by the professional licensing agency. Provides that an employee of a county, city, town, or township (unit) is considered to have resigned from employment with the unit if the employee assumes an elected executive office of the unit or becomes an elected member of the unit's legislative or fiscal body. Provides that a full-time paid firefighter or a volunteer firefighter may not assume or hold a position on the executive, legislative, or fiscal body of a unit that receives fire protection services from the department in which the firefighter serves. Specifies that the restriction does not prevent an elected officer from serving on a board, commission, or committee of the unit. Provides that the restriction does not prohibit an employee (including a full-time paid firefighter) or a volunteer firefighter from holding an elected office of another unit. Allows an employee (including a full-time paid firefighter) or a volunteer firefighter who assumes or holds an elected office on January 1, 2013, to continue to hold the office and be employed by the unit or serve as a volunteer firefighter until the expiration of the term of office. Provides that relatives may not be employed by a unit in positions that result in one relative being in the direct line of supervision of the other relative. Provides that an individual who is employed by a unit on July 1, 2012, is not subject to the provisions regarding nepotism unless the individual has a break in employment with the unit. Provides that for purposes of the nepotism law, the performance of the duties of a precinct election officer or a volunteer firefighter is not considered employment by a unit. Provides that an individual who is employed by a unit on the date the individual's relative begins serving a term of an elected office of the unit: (1) may remain employed by the unit and maintain the individual's position or rank even if the individual would be in the direct line of supervision of the individual's relative; and (2) may not be promoted to a position or, in the case of an individual who is a member of a merit police department or merit fire department, promoted to a position that is not within the merit ranks, if the new position would place the individual in the direct line of supervision of the individual's relative. Makes the following additional exceptions: (1) Allows a township trustee whose office is located in the trustee's personal residence to employ only one relative to work in the township trustee's office and be in the trustee's line of supervision. (2) Allows a coroner who is ineligible for another term of office due to term limits to be hired by the coroner's successor, even though the successor is a relative and will result in the coroner working in the successor's direct line of supervision. (3) Allows a sheriff to hire the sheriff's spouse as prison matron for the county and work in the sheriff's direct line of supervision. Limits the total compensation of the township trustee's employed relative to $5,000 per year. Provides that provisions concerning nepotism apply to a person who is a party to an employment contract with a unit. Requires a unit to implement a policy under the nepotism and contracting provisions. Allows a unit to implement a policy that is more stringent and detailed. Requires each elected official of the unit to annually certify in writing, subject to the penalties for perjury, that the official is in compliance with the nepotism and contracting law and to submit the certification to the executive of the local unit. Requires the executive of the local unit to file with the annual personnel report filed with the state board of accounts a statement regarding whether the unit has implemented a policy under the nepotism and contracting provisions Provides that a unit can enter into or renew: (1) a contract for the procurement of goods and services; or (2) a contract for public works; with a relative of an elected official or a business entity in which a relative has an ownership interest if the elected official does not violate the criminal conflict of interest statute and the elected official makes full, written disclosure and satisfies any other requirements of the public purchasing law or the public works law.
Title
Nepotism; conflict of interest.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-03-06 - House - House - House concurred in Senate amendments (Y: 62 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 19) [PASS]
2012-02-27 - Senate - Senate - Third reading: passed (Y: 30 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2012-01-30 - House - House - Third reading: passed (Y: 70 N: 26 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2012-01-25 - House - House - Amendment 1 (Pryor), failed (Y: 36 N: 59 NV: 2 Abs: 3) [FAIL]
2012-01-25 - House - House - Amendment 2 (Reske), failed (Y: 38 N: 58 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [FAIL]
2012-02-27 - Senate - Senate - Third reading: passed (Y: 30 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2012-01-30 - House - House - Third reading: passed (Y: 70 N: 26 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2012-01-25 - House - House - Amendment 1 (Pryor), failed (Y: 36 N: 59 NV: 2 Abs: 3) [FAIL]
2012-01-25 - House - House - Amendment 2 (Reske), failed (Y: 38 N: 58 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-03-19 | Signed by the Governor | |
2012-03-13 | Signed by the President Pro Tempore | |
2012-03-12 | Signed by the President of the Senate | |
2012-03-09 | Signed by the Speaker | |
2012-03-09 | Joint Rule 20 technical correction adopted by the House | |
2012-03-08 | Joint Rule 20 technical correction adopted by the Senate | |
2012-03-06 | House concurred in Senate amendments; Roll Call 349: yeas 62, nays 19 | |
2012-02-27 | Returned to the House with amendments | |
2012-02-27 | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 246: yeas 30 and nays 19 | |
2012-02-23 | Senator Schneider added as cosponsor | |
2012-02-23 | Amendment 10 (Lawson), prevailed; voice vote | |
2012-02-23 | Second reading: amended, ordered engrossed | |
2012-02-14 | Senator Mrvan added as cosponsor | |
2012-02-14 | Senator Miller added as cosponsor | |
2012-02-09 | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted | |
2012-02-01 | First reading: referred to Committee on Local Government | |
2012-01-30 | Representative Moseley removed as coauthor | |
2012-01-30 | Senate sponsors: Senators Lawson and Holdman | |
2012-01-30 | Referred to the Senate | |
2012-01-30 | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 125: yeas 70, nays 26 | |
2012-01-25 | Amendment 1 (Pryor), failed; Roll Call 55: yeas 36, nays 59 | |
2012-01-25 | Amendment 2 (Reske), failed; Roll Call 54: yeas 38, nays 58 | |
2012-01-25 | Second reading: ordered engrossed | |
2012-01-13 | Representatives Bacon, Baird, Behning, Borders, C. Brown, T. Brown, Burton, Candelaria Reardon, Cheatham, Cherry, Clere, Crouch, Culver, Davis, Davisson, Espich, Foley, Friend, Frizzell, Gutwein, Harris, Heaton, Heuer, Hinkle, Karickhoff, Klinker, Knollman, Kubacki, Lehe, Lehman, Leonard, McMillin, McNamara, Messmer, Morris, Moseley, Noe, Riecken, M. Smith, Soliday, Speedy, Stemler, Steuerwald, Sullivan, Torr, Truitt, Turner, Ubelhor, VanNatter, Welch, Wolkins and Yarde added as coauthors | |
2012-01-13 | House Rule 106.1 suspended | |
2012-01-13 | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted | |
2012-01-09 | Representative Wesco added as coauthor | |
2012-01-09 | First reading: referred to Committee on Government and Regulatory Reform | |
2012-01-09 | Coauthored by Representatives Bosma and Dobis | |
2012-01-09 | Authored by Representative Mahan |