IN HB1003 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 6-3)
Status: Passed on March 30 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-30 - Public Law 92
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Education matters. Provides that the state board of education (state board) shall determine the timing, frequency, and method of certain teacher training requirements, including whether the training should be required for purposes of obtaining or renewing a license or as part of the completion requirements for a teacher preparation program. Provides that the following apply to nonpublic schools accredited by a national or regional accrediting agency recognized by the state board: (1) Indiana secured school fund provisions. (2) Certain sale of school building provisions. (3) Certain textbook assistance provisions. Changes a provision concerning waivers from postsecondary readiness competency requirements that references "nonaccredited nonpublic school" to "nonaccredited nonpublic school that has less than one employee". Provides that the state board and the governing body of a school corporation or nonpublic school may not enter into, renew, or otherwise extend a contract to establish a freeway school after June 30, 2020. Provides that provisions relating to the establishment and administration of freeway schools expire July 1, 2025. Establishes new requirements to accredit a public or private school in Indiana. Provides that the state board may grant an application by a school or group of schools that requests to waive compliance with certain statutes or rules. Requires the state board to annually prepare a report that includes certain information regarding compliance waiver requests and provide the report to the general assembly. Provides that a school corporation may publish in a local newspaper a summary of the annual performance report with a description of how to find and view the full annual performance report on the Internet in lieu of publishing the whole annual performance report. Provides that a school corporation may publish in a local newspaper a summary of the annual financial report with a description of how to find and view the full annual financial report on the Internet in lieu of publishing the whole annual financial report. Repeals a provision that requires the state board to implement a system of recognizing certain education programs of nonpublic schools. Repeals: (1) a provision relating to performance based school accreditation; (2) a provision pertaining to school improvement plans; and (3) a provision pertaining to the recognition of educational programs of nonpublic schools. Makes conforming amendments and technical corrections.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Education matters.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-03-11 - Senate - Senate - Rules Suspended. Conference Committee Report 1 (Y: 40 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-03-11 - House - House - Rules Suspended. Conference Committee Report 1 (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2020-03-03 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 39 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-02 - Senate - Senate - Amendment #4 (Melton) failed (Y: 16 N: 34 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2020-03-02 - Senate - Senate - Amendment #3 (Garten) prevailed (Y: 32 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-27 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 9 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-19 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 10 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-28 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-01-27 - House - House - Amendment #1 (Wright) failed (Y: 31 N: 62 NV: 3 Abs: 4) [FAIL]
2020-01-27 - House - House Floor - (Y: 63 N: 31 NV: 2 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2020-01-22 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-30HousePublic Law 92
2020-03-18HouseSigned by the Governor
2020-03-18SenateSigned by the President of the Senate
2020-03-16HouseSigned by the Speaker
2020-03-12SenateSigned by the President Pro Tempore
2020-03-11SenateRules Suspended. Conference Committee Report 1: adopted by the Senate; Roll Call 386: yeas 40, nays 9
2020-03-11HouseRules Suspended. Conference Committee Report 1: adopted by the House; Roll Call 380: yeas 95, nays 0
2020-03-11SenateCCR # 1 filed in the Senate
2020-03-11HouseCCR # 1 filed in the House
2020-03-10SenateSenator Kruse added as conferee
2020-03-10SenateSenator Melton removed as conferee
2020-03-05SenateSenate advisors appointed: Buchanan, Niezgodski and Rogers
2020-03-05SenateSenate conferees appointed: Raatz and Melton
2020-03-04HouseHouse advisors appointed: Behning, Lauer, DeLaney, Klinker and Pfaff
2020-03-04HouseHouse conferees appointed: Jordan and Smith V
2020-03-04HouseHouse dissented from Senate amendments
2020-03-04HouseMotion to dissent filed
2020-03-04SenateReturned to the House with amendments
2020-03-03SenateThird reading: passed; Roll Call 270: yeas 39, nays 11
2020-03-02SenateSenator Randolph added as cosponsor
2020-03-02SenateAmendment #4 (Melton) failed; Roll Call 258: yeas 16, nays 34
2020-03-02SenateAmendment #5 (Melton) failed; voice vote
2020-03-02SenateAmendment #3 (Garten) prevailed; Roll Call 257: yeas 32, nays 18
2020-03-02SenateAmendment #2 (Raatz) prevailed; voice vote
2020-03-02SenateSecond reading: amended, ordered engrossed
2020-02-27SenateCommittee report: amend do pass, adopted
2020-02-20SenateCommittee report: amend do pass adopted; reassigned to Committee on Appropriations
2020-02-17SenateSenator Melton added as cosponsor
2020-02-17SenateSenator Rogers added as cosponsor
2020-02-05SenateFirst reading: referred to Committee on Education and Career Development
2020-01-29HouseReferred to the Senate
2020-01-28HouseSenate sponsors: Senators Raatz and Buchanan
2020-01-28HouseThird reading: passed; Roll Call 74: yeas 98, nays 0
2020-01-27HouseAppeal the ruling of the chair (Chyung); ruling of the chair sustained Roll Call 66: yeas 63, nays 31
2020-01-27HouseAmendment #2 (Chyung) ruled out of order
2020-01-27HouseAmendment #1 (Wright) failed; Roll Call 65: yeas 31, nays 62
2020-01-27HouseSecond reading: ordered engrossed
2020-01-23HouseRepresentative DeLaney added as coauthor
2020-01-23HouseCommittee report: amend do pass, adopted
2020-01-21HouseRepresentatives Thompson and Cook added as coauthors
2020-01-06HouseFirst reading: referred to Committee on Education
2020-01-06HouseAuthored by Representative Jordan

Indiana State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://iga.in.gov/legislative/2020/bills/house/1003/
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/4/0/4/c/404c2532/HB1003.01.INTR.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/9/2/1/b/921bf7bf/HB1003.01.INTR.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/7/d/d/c/7ddc40fd/HB1003.02.COMH.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/e/3/1/9/e3193cde/HB1003.02.COMH.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/8/b/f/8/8bf8f018/HB1003.03.COMS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/0/f/d/6/0fd6d859/HB1003.03.COMS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/6/b/f/9/6bf9493f/HB1003.04.COMS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/a/d/8/9/ad89b68b/HB1003.04.COMS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/e/e/7/c/ee7c365e/HB1003.05.ENGS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/3/2/d/a/32da7ee9/HB1003.05.ENGS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/d/2/f/b/d2fb0d05/HB1003.06.ENRS.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/7/f/e/3/7fe31ee2/HB1003.01.INTR.03.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/6/f/e/2/6fe22d14/HB1003.66_H.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/4/0/7/2/4072c287/HB1003.65_H.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/9/e/8/e/9e8eb8ce/HB1003.74_H.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/8/2/f/f/82ffd598/HB1003.02.COMH.02.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/8/0/4/1/80412ff1/HB1003.03.COMS.00.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/4/7/6/e/476ee043/HB1003.257_S.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/5/5/e/5/55e54091/HB1003.258_S.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/7/c/0/d/7c0d9556/HB1003.270_S.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/2/9/b/f/29bf8e56/HB1003.380_H.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/d/0/7/e/d07e2944/HB1003.386_S.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback