IN HB1003 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 6-3)
Status: Passed on March 30 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-30 - Public Law 92
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 6-3)
Status: Passed on March 30 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-30 - Public Law 92
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Education matters. Provides that the state board of education (state board) shall determine the timing, frequency, and method of certain teacher training requirements, including whether the training should be required for purposes of obtaining or renewing a license or as part of the completion requirements for a teacher preparation program. Provides that the following apply to nonpublic schools accredited by a national or regional accrediting agency recognized by the state board: (1) Indiana secured school fund provisions. (2) Certain sale of school building provisions. (3) Certain textbook assistance provisions. Changes a provision concerning waivers from postsecondary readiness competency requirements that references "nonaccredited nonpublic school" to "nonaccredited nonpublic school that has less than one employee". Provides that the state board and the governing body of a school corporation or nonpublic school may not enter into, renew, or otherwise extend a contract to establish a freeway school after June 30, 2020. Provides that provisions relating to the establishment and administration of freeway schools expire July 1, 2025. Establishes new requirements to accredit a public or private school in Indiana. Provides that the state board may grant an application by a school or group of schools that requests to waive compliance with certain statutes or rules. Requires the state board to annually prepare a report that includes certain information regarding compliance waiver requests and provide the report to the general assembly. Provides that a school corporation may publish in a local newspaper a summary of the annual performance report with a description of how to find and view the full annual performance report on the Internet in lieu of publishing the whole annual performance report. Provides that a school corporation may publish in a local newspaper a summary of the annual financial report with a description of how to find and view the full annual financial report on the Internet in lieu of publishing the whole annual financial report. Repeals a provision that requires the state board to implement a system of recognizing certain education programs of nonpublic schools. Repeals: (1) a provision relating to performance based school accreditation; (2) a provision pertaining to school improvement plans; and (3) a provision pertaining to the recognition of educational programs of nonpublic schools. Makes conforming amendments and technical corrections.
Title
Education matters.
Sponsors
Rep. Jack Jordan [R] | Rep. Jeffrey Thompson [R] | Rep. Anthony Cook [R] | Rep. Edward DeLaney [D] |
Sen. Jeff Raatz [R] | Sen. Brian Buchanan [R] | Sen. Linda Rogers [R] | Sen. Eddie Melton [D] |
Sen. Lonnie Randolph [D] |
Roll Calls
2020-03-11 - Senate - Senate - Rules Suspended. Conference Committee Report 1 (Y: 40 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-03-11 - House - House - Rules Suspended. Conference Committee Report 1 (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2020-03-03 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 39 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-02 - Senate - Senate - Amendment #4 (Melton) failed (Y: 16 N: 34 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2020-03-02 - Senate - Senate - Amendment #3 (Garten) prevailed (Y: 32 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-27 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 9 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-19 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 10 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-28 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-01-27 - House - House - Amendment #1 (Wright) failed (Y: 31 N: 62 NV: 3 Abs: 4) [FAIL]
2020-01-27 - House - House Floor - (Y: 63 N: 31 NV: 2 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2020-01-22 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-11 - House - House - Rules Suspended. Conference Committee Report 1 (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2020-03-03 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 39 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-02 - Senate - Senate - Amendment #4 (Melton) failed (Y: 16 N: 34 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2020-03-02 - Senate - Senate - Amendment #3 (Garten) prevailed (Y: 32 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-27 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 9 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-19 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 10 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-28 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-01-27 - House - House - Amendment #1 (Wright) failed (Y: 31 N: 62 NV: 3 Abs: 4) [FAIL]
2020-01-27 - House - House Floor - (Y: 63 N: 31 NV: 2 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2020-01-22 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-30 | House | Public Law 92 |
2020-03-18 | House | Signed by the Governor |
2020-03-18 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2020-03-16 | House | Signed by the Speaker |
2020-03-12 | Senate | Signed by the President Pro Tempore |
2020-03-11 | Senate | Rules Suspended. Conference Committee Report 1: adopted by the Senate; Roll Call 386: yeas 40, nays 9 |
2020-03-11 | House | Rules Suspended. Conference Committee Report 1: adopted by the House; Roll Call 380: yeas 95, nays 0 |
2020-03-11 | Senate | CCR # 1 filed in the Senate |
2020-03-11 | House | CCR # 1 filed in the House |
2020-03-10 | Senate | Senator Kruse added as conferee |
2020-03-10 | Senate | Senator Melton removed as conferee |
2020-03-05 | Senate | Senate advisors appointed: Buchanan, Niezgodski and Rogers |
2020-03-05 | Senate | Senate conferees appointed: Raatz and Melton |
2020-03-04 | House | House advisors appointed: Behning, Lauer, DeLaney, Klinker and Pfaff |
2020-03-04 | House | House conferees appointed: Jordan and Smith V |
2020-03-04 | House | House dissented from Senate amendments |
2020-03-04 | House | Motion to dissent filed |
2020-03-04 | Senate | Returned to the House with amendments |
2020-03-03 | Senate | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 270: yeas 39, nays 11 |
2020-03-02 | Senate | Senator Randolph added as cosponsor |
2020-03-02 | Senate | Amendment #4 (Melton) failed; Roll Call 258: yeas 16, nays 34 |
2020-03-02 | Senate | Amendment #5 (Melton) failed; voice vote |
2020-03-02 | Senate | Amendment #3 (Garten) prevailed; Roll Call 257: yeas 32, nays 18 |
2020-03-02 | Senate | Amendment #2 (Raatz) prevailed; voice vote |
2020-03-02 | Senate | Second reading: amended, ordered engrossed |
2020-02-27 | Senate | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted |
2020-02-20 | Senate | Committee report: amend do pass adopted; reassigned to Committee on Appropriations |
2020-02-17 | Senate | Senator Melton added as cosponsor |
2020-02-17 | Senate | Senator Rogers added as cosponsor |
2020-02-05 | Senate | First reading: referred to Committee on Education and Career Development |
2020-01-29 | House | Referred to the Senate |
2020-01-28 | House | Senate sponsors: Senators Raatz and Buchanan |
2020-01-28 | House | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 74: yeas 98, nays 0 |
2020-01-27 | House | Appeal the ruling of the chair (Chyung); ruling of the chair sustained Roll Call 66: yeas 63, nays 31 |
2020-01-27 | House | Amendment #2 (Chyung) ruled out of order |
2020-01-27 | House | Amendment #1 (Wright) failed; Roll Call 65: yeas 31, nays 62 |
2020-01-27 | House | Second reading: ordered engrossed |
2020-01-23 | House | Representative DeLaney added as coauthor |
2020-01-23 | House | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted |
2020-01-21 | House | Representatives Thompson and Cook added as coauthors |
2020-01-06 | House | First reading: referred to Committee on Education |
2020-01-06 | House | Authored by Representative Jordan |