IN HB1003 | 2017 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 6-1)
Status: Passed on April 28 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-28 - Public Law 242
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Student assessments. Replaces the ISTEP test program after June 30, 2018, with a new statewide assessment program to be known as Indiana's Learning Evaluation Assessment Readiness Network (ILEARN). Provides that after June 30, 2018, a student must complete a graduation pathway requirement rather than pass a graduation exam. Urges the legislative council to assign to the interim study committee on education for study during the 2017 interim of the general assembly the topic of Indiana's laws concerning school certificated employee evaluations. Provides that not later than November 1, 2017, the department of education (department) shall make recommendations to the general

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Student assessments. Replaces the ISTEP test program after June 30, 2018, with a new statewide assessment program to be known as Indiana's Learning Evaluation Assessment Readiness Network (ILEARN). Provides that after June 30, 2018, a student must complete a graduation pathway requirement rather than pass a graduation exam. Urges the legislative council to assign to the interim study committee on education for study during the 2017 interim of the general assembly the topic of Indiana's laws concerning school certificated employee evaluations. Provides that not later than November 1, 2017, the department of education (department) shall make recommendations to the general

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-04-21 - Senate - Senate - Rules Suspended. Conference Committee Report 1 (Y: 39 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-21 - House - House - Rules Suspended. Conference Committee Report 1 (Y: 68 N: 29 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-04-04 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 32 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-03-29 - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-20 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 67 N: 31 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-02-16 - House - House - Amendment #9 (Cook) prevailed (Y: 87 N: 2 NV: 2 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2017-02-16 - House - House - Amendment #5 (DeLaney) failed (Y: 30 N: 59 NV: 2 Abs: 9) [FAIL]
2017-02-09 - House - Committee Vote (Y: 10 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-04-28HousePublic Law 242
2017-04-28HouseSigned by the Governor
2017-04-27SenateSigned by the President Pro Tempore
2017-04-27HouseSigned by the Speaker
2017-04-26SenateSigned by the President of the Senate
2017-04-21HouseRules Suspended. Conference Committee Report 1: adopted by the House; Roll Call 559: yeas 68, nays 29
2017-04-21SenateRules Suspended. Conference Committee Report 1: adopted by the Senate; Roll Call 538: yeas 39, nays 11
2017-04-21HouseCCR # 1 filed in the House
2017-04-21SenateCCR # 1 filed in the Senate
2017-04-21SenateSenator Raatz removed as advisor
2017-04-21SenateSenator Raatz added as conferee
2017-04-21SenateSenator Melton removed as conferee
2017-04-21HouseRepresentative Cook added as conferee
2017-04-21HouseRepresentatives Cook and Brown T removed as advisors
2017-04-21HouseRepresentative Smith V removed as conferee
2017-04-11HouseRepresentative McNamara added as advisor
2017-04-10SenateSenate advisors appointed: Raatz, Stoops, Bassler and Zay
2017-04-10SenateSenator Leising added as advisor
2017-04-10HouseHouse advisors appointed: Cook, Brown T, DeLaney and Errington
2017-04-10SenateSenate conferees appointed: Kruse and Melton
2017-04-10HouseHouse conferees appointed: Behning and Smith V
2017-04-06HouseHouse dissented from Senate amendments
2017-04-06HouseMotion to dissent filed
2017-04-05SenateReturned to the House with amendments
2017-04-04SenateThird reading: passed; Roll Call 361: yeas 32, nays 16
2017-04-03SenateSenator Melton added as cosponsor
2017-04-03SenateSenator Leising added as cosponsor
2017-04-03SenateSenator Raatz added as third sponsor
2017-04-03SenateAmendment #3 (Kruse) prevailed; voice vote
2017-04-03SenateAmendment #4 (Kruse) prevailed; voice vote
2017-04-03SenateAmendment #1 (Melton) failed; voice vote
2017-04-03SenateAmendment #2 (Melton) failed; voice vote
2017-04-03SenateSecond reading: amended, ordered engrossed
2017-03-30SenateCommittee report: amend do pass, adopted
2017-02-23SenateFirst reading: referred to Committee on Education and Career Development
2017-02-21HouseReferred to the Senate
2017-02-20HouseSenate sponsors: Senators Kruse and Bassler
2017-02-20HouseThird reading: passed; Roll Call 158: yeas 67, nays 31
2017-02-16HouseRepresentative Brown, T. added as coauthor
2017-02-16HouseAmendment #9 (Cook) prevailed; Roll Call 129: yeas 87, nays 2
2017-02-16HouseAmendment #5 (DeLaney) failed; Roll Call 128: yeas 30, nays 59
2017-02-16HouseSecond reading: amended, ordered engrossed
2017-02-13HouseCommittee report: amend do pass, adopted
2017-01-12HouseFirst reading: referred to Committee on Education
2017-01-12HouseAuthored by Representative Behning

Indiana State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://iga.in.gov/legislative/2017/bills/house/1003/
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/a/5/3/b/a53b96d4/HB1003.01.INTR.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/8/f/0/9/8f0952f9/HB1003.01.INTR.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/f/0/8/0/f080a7d1/HB1003.02.COMH.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/3/1/f/a/31fa2fd1/HB1003.02.COMH.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/0/0/6/e/006e0d89/HB1003.03.ENGH.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/0/0/3/a/003aa882/HB1003.03.ENGH.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/c/8/d/d/c8ddfe6f/HB1003.04.COMS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/4/5/8/e/458eaf65/HB1003.04.COMS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/b/5/a/2/b5a2f793/HB1003.05.ENGS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/a/b/2/e/ab2e7615/HB1003.06.ENRS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/d/8/4/e/d84e0ab9/HB1003.05.ENGS.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/c/0/1/c/c01c1063/HB1003.01.INTR.00.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/4/c/6/c/4c6c452f/HB1003.128.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/e/f/e/8/efe8241e/HB1003.129.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/8/7/0/1/8701f013/HB1003.158.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/3/6/8/4/3684a049/HB1003.03.ENGH.00.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/5/c/3/8/5c3825a3/HB1003.361.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/c/d/5/f/cd5fc307/HB1003.559.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/c/2/f/0/c2f0b7a0/HB1003.538.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback