IL SR1826 | 2015-2016 | 99th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 31 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-05-31 - Resolution Adopted
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 31 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-05-31 - Resolution Adopted
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Declares November of 2016 as Lung Cancer Awareness Month.
Title
LUNG CANCER AWARENESS MONTH
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-05-31 | Senate | Resolution Adopted |
2016-05-26 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of Secretary's Desk Resolutions May 27, 2016 |
2016-05-26 | Senate | Be Adopted State Government and Veterans Affairs; 006-000-000 |
2016-05-17 | Senate | Assigned to State Government and Veterans Affairs |
2016-05-04 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2016-05-04 | Senate | Filed with Secretary |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=1826&GAID=13&DocTypeID=SR&SessionID=88&GA=99 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/99/SR/09900SR1826.htm |