IL SR0792 | 2021-2022 | 102nd General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 14-7)
Status: Passed on April 9 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-09 - Resolution Adopted; 053-000-000
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 14-7)
Status: Passed on April 9 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-09 - Resolution Adopted; 053-000-000
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Directs the Auditor General to conduct an audit of Medicaid MCOs.
Title
AUDIT-MEDICAID MCOS
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-04-08 - Senate - Motion To Adopt in Senate (Y: 53 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-09 | Senate | Resolution Adopted; 053-000-000 |
2022-04-09 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Diane Pappas |
2022-04-08 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Terri Bryant |
2022-04-06 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Jacqueline Y. Collins |
2022-04-06 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Laura M. Murphy |
2022-04-06 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Chapin Rose |
2022-04-06 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Omar Aquino |
2022-04-06 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Neil Anderson |
2022-04-05 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Patrick J. Joyce |
2022-04-05 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Scott M. Bennett |
2022-04-05 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Sara Feigenholtz |
2022-04-04 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Antonio Muñoz |
2022-03-10 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Linda Holmes |
2022-02-17 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. John Connor |
2022-02-16 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Laura Fine |
2022-02-16 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Rachelle Crowe |
2022-02-16 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of Secretary's Desk Resolutions February 17, 2022 |
2022-02-16 | Senate | Be Adopted Health; 014-000-000 |
2022-02-14 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Win Stoller |
2022-02-09 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Doris Turner |
2022-02-09 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Jil Tracy |
2022-02-08 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Dale Fowler |
2022-02-08 | Senate | Assigned to Health |
2022-01-27 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Sally J. Turner |
2022-01-21 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2022-01-21 | Senate | Filed with Secretary |