IL SR0094 | 2009-2010 | 96th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 6 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-03-06 - Resolution Adopted; 053-000-000
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 6 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-03-06 - Resolution Adopted; 053-000-000
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Resolves that the Department of Healthcare and Family Services shall identify and target resources to increase the capacity to meet needs and desires of the population who could benefit from home health care and to prepare for future demands to build the capacity in the system now and into the future.
Title
DHFS-HOME HEALTH CARE
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2009-03-06 - Senate - Motion To Adopt in Senate (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-03-06 | Resolution Adopted; 053-000-000 | |
2009-03-05 | Placed on Calendar Order of Secretary's Desk Resolutions March 6, 2009 | |
2009-03-05 | Be Adopted Human Services; 009-000-000 | |
2009-02-25 | Referred to Human Services | |
2009-02-19 | Referred to Assignments | |
2009-02-19 | Filed with Secretary |