IL SJR0047 | 2021-2022 | 102nd General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Passed on April 8 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-08 - Adopted Both Houses
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Passed on April 8 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-08 - Adopted Both Houses
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Creates the Task Force on Children Advocacy Centers and Court Appointed Special Advocates for Children Funding to ensure that each CAC and CASA facility receives adequate funding to respond to the number and severity of child abuse and neglect cases in their respective jurisdictions.
Title
CASA/CAC FUNDING TASK FORCE
Sponsors
Sen. Julie Morrison [D] | Rep. Terra Costa Howard [D] | Rep. Deborah Conroy [D] | Rep. Kathleen Willis [D] |
Rep. Camille Lilly [D] | Rep. Mary Flowers [D] |
Roll Calls
2022-04-08 - House - Motion in House (Y: 111 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-04-06 - Senate - Motion To Adopt in Senate (Y: 58 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-06 - Senate - Motion To Adopt in Senate (Y: 58 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-08 | Senate | Adopted Both Houses |
2022-04-08 | House | Resolution Adopted 111-000-000 |
2022-04-08 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of Resolutions |
2022-04-08 | House | Recommends Be Adopted Appropriations-Human Services Committee; 023-000-000 |
2022-04-08 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Mary E. Flowers |
2022-04-08 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Camille Y. Lilly |
2022-04-08 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Kathleen Willis |
2022-04-08 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Deb Conroy |
2022-04-08 | House | Suspend Rule 21 - Prevailed |
2022-04-08 | House | Moved to Suspend Rule 21 Rep. Greg Harris |
2022-04-07 | House | Assigned to Appropriations-Human Services Committee |
2022-04-06 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2022-04-06 | House | Chief House Sponsor Rep. Terra Costa Howard |
2022-04-06 | House | Arrived in House |
2022-04-06 | Senate | Resolution Adopted; 058-000-000 |
2022-03-23 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of Secretary's Desk Resolutions March 24, 2022 |
2022-03-23 | Senate | Be Adopted Health; 012-000-000 |
2022-03-16 | Senate | Assigned to Health |
2022-02-10 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2022-02-10 | Senate | Filed with Secretary |