IL SJR0043 | 2023-2024 | 103rd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 25 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-05-28 - Chief House Sponsor Rep. David Friess
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 25 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-05-28 - Chief House Sponsor Rep. David Friess
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Designates the section of Route 51 that runs through St. Johns as the "LCpl. Drew M. Uhles Memorial Highway".
Title
LCPL. UHLES MEMORIAL HIGHWAY
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-05-25 - Senate - Motion To Adopt in Senate (Y: 55 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-05-28 | House | Chief House Sponsor Rep. David Friess |
2024-05-25 | House | Arrived in House |
2024-05-25 | Senate | Resolution Adopted; 055-000-000 |
2024-05-24 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Jason Plummer |
2024-05-24 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of Secretary's Desk Resolutions |
2024-05-24 | Senate | Approved for Consideration Assignments |
2023-10-18 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2023-10-18 | Senate | Filed with Secretary |