IL SJR0034 | 2013-2014 | 98th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 18 2013 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-04-18 - Resolution Adopted
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 18 2013 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-04-18 - Resolution Adopted
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
RESOLVED, BY THE SENATE OF THE NINETY-EIGHTH GENERAL ASSEMBLY OF THE STATE OF ILLINOIS, THE HOUSE OF REPRESENTATIVES CONCURRING HEREIN, that when the two Houses adjourn on Thursday, April 18, 2013, the Senate stands adjourned until Tuesday, April 23, 2013, and when it adjourns on that day, it stands adjourned until Wednesday, April 24, 2013, and when it adjourns on that day, it stands adjourned until Thursday, April 25, 2013, and when it adjourns on that day it stands adjourned until April 30, 2013, or until the call of the President ; and the House of Representatives stands adjourned until Friday, April 19, 2013, and when it adjourns on that day, it stands adjourned until Tuesday, April 30, 2013, or until the call of the Speaker.
Title
ADJOURN HOUSE & SENATE
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-04-18 | House | Resolution Adopted |
2013-04-18 | House | Chief House Sponsor Rep. Barbara Flynn Currie |
2013-04-18 | House | Arrived in House |
2013-04-18 | Senate | Resolution Adopted |
2013-04-18 | Senate | Prevailed to Suspend Rule ; 3-6(a) |
2013-04-18 | Senate | Moved to Suspend Rule Sen. John M. Sullivan; 3-6(a) |
2013-04-18 | Senate | Filed with Secretary |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=34&GAID=12&DocTypeID=SJR&SessionID=85&GA=98 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/98/SJR/09800SJ0034.htm |