IL SJR0013 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-2)
Status: Passed on June 2 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-02 - Adopted Both Houses
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-2)
Status: Passed on June 2 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-02 - Adopted Both Houses
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Creates the Elder Abuse Task Force to investigate the effectiveness of current elder protective services and laws, examine barriers to prosecution and strategies to increase public awareness of elder abuse and reporting, study training resources and best practices in other states, and identify a long-range plan to combat elder abuse.
Title
ELDER ABUSE TASK FORCE
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-06-02 - Senate - Concurrence in Senate (Y: 57 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-01 - House - Motion in House (Y: 115 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-12 - Senate - Motion To Adopt in Senate (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-01 - House - Motion in House (Y: 115 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-12 - Senate - Motion To Adopt in Senate (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-02 | Senate | Adopted Both Houses |
2019-06-02 | Senate | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Senate Concurs 057-000-000 |
2019-06-02 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Jennifer Bertino-Tarrant |
2019-06-02 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Jacqueline Y. Collins |
2019-06-02 | Senate | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Be Approved for Consideration Assignments |
2019-06-02 | Senate | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Referred to Assignments |
2019-06-02 | Senate | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Filed with Secretary Sen. Rachelle Crowe |
2019-06-02 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of Concurrence House Amendment(s) 1 - June 2, 2019 |
2019-06-02 | Senate | Secretary's Desk - Concurrence House Amendment(s) 1 |
2019-06-01 | House | Resolution Adopted as Amended 115-000-000 |
2019-06-01 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted |
2019-06-01 | House | Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Changed to Rep. Kelly M. Burke |
2019-06-01 | House | Alternate Co-Sponsor Removed Rep. Frances Ann Hurley |
2019-06-01 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Frances Ann Hurley |
2019-06-01 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Kelly M. Burke |
2019-06-01 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. LaToya Greenwood |
2019-06-01 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Deanne M. Mazzochi |
2019-05-20 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommends Be Adopted Rules Committee; 004-000-000 |
2019-05-16 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2019-05-16 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Katie Stuart |
2019-05-16 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Fred Crespo |
2019-05-16 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of Resolutions |
2019-05-15 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Jeff Keicher |
2019-05-15 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Monica Bristow |
2019-05-15 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Frances Ann Hurley |
2019-05-15 | House | Recommends Be Adopted Human Services Committee; 011-000-000 |
2019-05-14 | House | Motion to Suspend Rule 21 - Prevailed |
2019-05-14 | House | Motion Filed to Suspend Rule 21 Human Services Committee; Rep. Gregory Harris |
2019-05-07 | House | Assigned to Human Services Committee |
2019-05-02 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2019-05-02 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Joyce Mason |
2019-05-02 | House | Chief House Sponsor Rep. Katie Stuart |
2019-04-15 | House | Arrived in House |
2019-04-12 | Senate | Resolution Adopted; 052-000-000 |
2019-03-13 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Jennifer Bertino-Tarrant |
2019-03-12 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of Secretary's Desk Resolutions March 13, 2019 |
2019-03-12 | Senate | Be Adopted Human Services; 010-000-000 |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Assigned to Human Services |
2019-02-05 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2019-02-05 | Senate | Filed with Secretary |