IL SB4194 | 2021-2022 | 102nd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-1)
Status: Introduced on March 7 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-14 - Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Laura M. Murphy
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 7 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-14 - Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Laura M. Murphy
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Makes appropriations for the Department of Commerce and Economic Opportunity for the fiscal year beginning July 1, 2022. Effective July 1, 2022.
Title
$NORMAL BILL
Sponsors
Sen. William Cunningham [D] | Sen. John Curran [R] | Sen. Laura Fine [D] | Sen. Melinda Bush [D] |
Sen. Sara Feigenholtz [D] | Sen. Laura Murphy [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-14 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Laura M. Murphy |
2022-03-10 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Sara Feigenholtz |
2022-03-09 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Melinda Bush |
2022-03-09 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Laura Fine |
2022-03-08 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. John F. Curran |
2022-03-07 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2022-03-07 | Senate | First Reading |
2022-03-07 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Bill Cunningham |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=4194&GAID=16&DocTypeID=SB&SessionID=110&GA=102 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/102/SB/PDF/10200SB4194.pdf |