IL SB4191 | 2021-2022 | 102nd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on March 4 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-22 - Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. David Koehler
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 4 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-22 - Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. David Koehler
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Appropriates $ 250,000,000, or so much thereof as may be necessary, from the State Coronavirus Urgent Remediation Emergency Fund to the Department of Commerce and Economic Opportunity for the purposes of the Hotel Jobs Recovery Grant Program, as allowed under the American Rescue Plan Act of 2021 and any associated federal guidance. Effective July 1, 2022.
Title
$DCEO-HOTEL GRANTS
Sponsors
Sen. Sara Feigenholtz [D] | Sen. Doris Turner [D] | Sen. David Koehler [D] | Sen. Mattie Hunter [D] |
Sen. Omar Aquino [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-22 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. David Koehler |
2022-03-22 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Doris Turner |
2022-03-08 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Omar Aquino |
2022-03-08 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Mattie Hunter |
2022-03-04 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2022-03-04 | Senate | First Reading |
2022-03-04 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Sara Feigenholtz |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=4191&GAID=16&DocTypeID=SB&SessionID=110&GA=102 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/102/SB/PDF/10200SB4191.pdf |