IL SB4181 | 2021-2022 | 102nd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 15-0)
Status: Introduced on February 23 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-10 - Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Sally J. Turner
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 23 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-10 - Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Sally J. Turner
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Illinois Income Tax Act and the Invest in Kids Act. Provides that the Invest in Kids credit applies permanently (currently, the credit applies for taxable years ending before January 1, 2023). Makes a formatting change to create a first priority group for eligible students who received a scholarship from a scholarship granting organization during the previous school year. Provides that qualified schools may establish a maximum scholarship amount, which may not exceed the necessary costs and fees for attendance at the qualified school. Provides that the qualified school shall notify the scholarship granting organization of its necessary costs and fees as well as any maximum scholarship amount set by the school. Effective immediately.
Title
INVEST IN KIDS-VARIOUS
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-10 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Sally J. Turner |
2022-03-09 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Sue Rezin |
2022-03-03 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Dave Syverson |
2022-03-02 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Dan McConchie |
2022-03-01 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Craig Wilcox |
2022-03-01 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Brian W. Stewart |
2022-03-01 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Steve McClure |
2022-02-25 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Donald P. DeWitte |
2022-02-25 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Jason A. Barickman |
2022-02-25 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Jason Plummer |
2022-02-25 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Win Stoller |
2022-02-25 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Neil Anderson |
2022-02-25 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Dale Fowler |
2022-02-25 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Darren Bailey |
2022-02-23 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2022-02-23 | Senate | First Reading |
2022-02-23 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Jil Tracy |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
35 | 40 | 40 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
35 | 40 | 65 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
35 | 5 | 224 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=4181&GAID=16&DocTypeID=SB&SessionID=110&GA=102 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/102/SB/10200SB4181.htm |