IL SB3972 | 2021-2022 | 102nd General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 24-4)
Status: Passed on May 13 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-13 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 102-0874
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 24-4)
Status: Passed on May 13 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-13 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 102-0874
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the School Code. Requires the State Board of Education, beginning with the 2025-2026 school year and continuing for not less than 2 years, to make available a model program of study that incorporates the training and experience necessary to serve as a direct support professional. Requires the State Board, by July 1, 2023, to submit recommendations developed in consultation with stakeholders, including, but not limited to, organizations representing community-based providers serving children and adults with intellectual or developmental disabilities, and education practitioners, including, but not limited to, teachers, administrators, special education directors, and regional superintendents of schools, to the Department of Human Services for the training that would be required in order to be complete the model program of study.
Title
SCH CD-CAREER CONNECT PROGRAM
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-04-01 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 108 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-02-24 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 55 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-24 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 55 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-13 | Senate | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 102-0874 |
2022-05-13 | Senate | Effective Date January 1, 2023 |
2022-05-13 | Senate | Governor Approved |
2022-04-29 | Senate | Sent to the Governor |
2022-04-01 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Denyse Wang Stoneback |
2022-04-01 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Anna Moeller |
2022-04-01 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Fred Crespo |
2022-04-01 | Senate | Passed Both Houses |
2022-04-01 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 108-000-000 |
2022-03-29 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Frances Ann Hurley |
2022-03-28 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Barbara Hernandez |
2022-03-25 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Stephanie A. Kifowit |
2022-03-25 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Sonya M. Harper |
2022-03-24 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Norine K. Hammond |
2022-03-24 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Dagmara Avelar |
2022-03-23 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2022-03-23 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2022-03-21 | House | Alternate Co-Sponsor Removed Rep. Anna Moeller |
2022-03-21 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Anna Moeller |
2022-03-21 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Mark Luft |
2022-03-21 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Suzanne Ness |
2022-03-21 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Terra Costa Howard |
2022-03-16 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Theresa Mah |
2022-03-16 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Elizabeth Hernandez |
2022-03-16 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2022-03-15 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Appropriations-Elementary & Secondary Education Committee; 016-000-000 |
2022-03-15 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Will Guzzardi |
2022-03-14 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Robyn Gabel |
2022-03-14 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Jonathan Carroll |
2022-03-07 | House | Assigned to Appropriations-Elementary & Secondary Education Committee |
2022-02-25 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2022-02-25 | House | First Reading |
2022-02-25 | House | Chief House Sponsor Rep. Michelle Mussman |
2022-02-25 | House | Arrived in House |
2022-02-24 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Kimberly A. Lightford |
2022-02-24 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 055-000-000 |
2022-02-24 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading |
2022-02-24 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted; Murphy |
2022-02-24 | Senate | Recalled to Second Reading |
2022-02-24 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Terri Bryant |
2022-02-23 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Laura Fine |
2022-02-23 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Dale Fowler |
2022-02-22 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommend Do Adopt Education; 015-000-000 |
2022-02-22 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading February 23, 2022 |
2022-02-22 | Senate | Second Reading |
2022-02-22 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Education |
2022-02-18 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2022-02-18 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Laura M. Murphy |
2022-02-14 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Jacqueline Y. Collins |
2022-02-14 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Cristina Castro |
2022-02-10 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Julie A. Morrison |
2022-02-09 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Karina Villa |
2022-02-09 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading February 10, 2022 |
2022-02-09 | Senate | Do Pass Education; 015-000-000 |
2022-02-01 | Senate | Assigned to Education |
2022-01-26 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Thomas Cullerton |
2022-01-21 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2022-01-21 | Senate | First Reading |
2022-01-21 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Laura M. Murphy |