IL SB3882 | 2021-2022 | 102nd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 24-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 24 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-04-01 - Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Cristina H. Pacione-Zayas
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 24 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-04-01 - Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Cristina H. Pacione-Zayas
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Reinserts the provisions of Senate Amendment No. 1 with the following changes: Requires the Department of Human Services to maintain an electronic listing of the certificates of tax credit issued by which the Department of Revenue may verify tax credit certificates issued to qualifying employers. Provides that the tax credit authorized under the Act may not be carried forward. Provides that a taxpayer who is a qualified employer who has received a certificate of tax credit from the Department shall be allowed a credit against the tax imposed equal to the amount shown on such certificate of tax credit. Provides that if the taxpayer is a partnership or Subchapter S corporation the credit shall be allowed to the partners or shareholders in accordance with the determination of income and distributive share of income as provided under specified provisions of the Internal Revenue Code. Makes other changes. Amends the Illinois Income Tax Act. Provides that for taxable years beginning on or after January 1, 2023, a taxpayer who has been awarded a credit under the Recovery and Mental Health Tax Credit Act is entitled to a credit against the tax imposed under specified provisions of the Illinois Income Tax Act.
Title
REVENUE-SUBSTANCE ABUSE
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-02-24 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 53 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-01 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Cristina H. Pacione-Zayas |
2022-03-25 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2022-03-22 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Sara Feigenholtz |
2022-03-11 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Antonio Muñoz |
2022-03-10 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Emil Jones, III |
2022-03-09 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Rachelle Crowe |
2022-03-09 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. David Koehler |
2022-03-09 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Karina Villa |
2022-03-09 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Meg Loughran Cappel |
2022-03-09 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Suzy Glowiak Hilton |
2022-03-09 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Cristina Castro |
2022-03-09 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Julie A. Morrison |
2022-03-07 | House | Assigned to Revenue & Finance Committee |
2022-02-25 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2022-02-25 | House | First Reading |
2022-02-25 | House | Chief House Sponsor Rep. Anne Stava-Murray |
2022-02-25 | House | Arrived in House |
2022-02-24 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Jacqueline Y. Collins |
2022-02-24 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Laura M. Murphy |
2022-02-24 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 053-000-000 |
2022-02-24 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading |
2022-02-24 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Adopted; Fine |
2022-02-24 | Senate | Recalled to Second Reading |
2022-02-23 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommend Do Adopt Revenue; 010-000-000 |
2022-02-22 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Celina Villanueva |
2022-02-22 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Christopher Belt |
2022-02-22 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Assignments Refers to Revenue |
2022-02-17 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Assignments |
2022-02-17 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Laura Fine |
2022-02-16 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Kimberly A. Lightford |
2022-02-16 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Elgie R. Sims, Jr. |
2022-02-16 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Michael E. Hastings |
2022-02-16 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Patricia Van Pelt |
2022-02-16 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Mattie Hunter |
2022-02-15 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading February 16, 2022 |
2022-02-15 | Senate | Second Reading |
2022-02-15 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Adriane Johnson |
2022-02-10 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading February 15, 2022 |
2022-02-10 | Senate | Do Pass as Amended Revenue; 011-000-000 |
2022-02-09 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted |
2022-02-09 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Robert F. Martwick |
2022-02-09 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Revenue |
2022-02-07 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2022-02-07 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Laura Fine |
2022-02-01 | Senate | Assigned to Revenue |
2022-01-21 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2022-01-21 | Senate | First Reading |
2022-01-21 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Laura Fine |