IL SB3853 | 2021-2022 | 102nd General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 14-1)
Status: Passed on May 27 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-27 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 102-1029
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 14-1)
Status: Passed on May 27 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-27 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 102-1029
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Reinserts the provisions of the engrossed bill with the following changes: Permits the Department of Children and Family Services to consult with independent partners to review Extended Family Support Program services and advise if additional services are needed prior to the start of the 3-year pilot program scheduled to be implemented on January 1, 2023. Provides that the services for the Extended Family Support Program are expanded given the program's inclusion in the Family First Prevention Services Act's targeted populations. Sets forth other targeted populations. Provides that funding through Title IV-E of the Social Security Act shall be spent on services to prevent children and youth who are candidates for foster care from coming into care and allow them to remain with their families. Provides that the Department shall arrange for an independent evaluation of the pilot program to determine whether the pilot program is successfully supporting families receiving Extended Family Support Program services or Family First Prevention Program services. Effective immediately.
Title
EXTENDED FAMILY SUPPORT SERVCS
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-04-06 - Senate - Concurrence in Senate (Y: 58 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-01 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 107 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-02-16 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 54 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-01 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 107 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-02-16 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 54 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-27 | Senate | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 102-1029 |
2022-05-27 | Senate | Effective Date May 27, 2022 |
2022-05-27 | Senate | Governor Approved |
2022-05-05 | Senate | Sent to the Governor |
2022-04-06 | Senate | Passed Both Houses |
2022-04-06 | Senate | Senate Concurs |
2022-04-06 | Senate | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Senate Concurs 058-000-000 |
2022-04-06 | Senate | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion To Concur Recommended Do Adopt Health; 010-000-000 |
2022-04-05 | Senate | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Assignments Referred to Health |
2022-04-04 | Senate | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Referred to Assignments |
2022-04-04 | Senate | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Filed with Secretary Sen. Julie A. Morrison |
2022-04-01 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of Concurrence House Amendment(s) 1 - April 4, 2022 |
2022-04-01 | Senate | Secretary's Desk - Concurrence House Amendment(s) 1 |
2022-04-01 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 107-000-000 |
2022-04-01 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Cristina H. Pacione-Zayas |
2022-03-23 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2022-03-23 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2022-03-22 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Sara Feigenholtz |
2022-03-18 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Michelle Mussman |
2022-03-17 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2022-03-17 | House | Do Pass as Amended / Short Debate Appropriations-Human Services Committee; 018-000-001 |
2022-03-17 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Appropriations-Human Services Committee; by Voice Vote |
2022-03-15 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Appropriations-Human Services Committee |
2022-03-14 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Laura M. Murphy |
2022-03-11 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Antonio Muñoz |
2022-03-10 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Emil Jones, III |
2022-03-10 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Christopher Belt |
2022-03-10 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2022-03-10 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Terra Costa Howard |
2022-03-09 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. David Koehler |
2022-03-09 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Meg Loughran Cappel |
2022-03-09 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Suzy Glowiak Hilton |
2022-03-09 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Cristina Castro |
2022-03-07 | House | Assigned to Appropriations-Human Services Committee |
2022-02-16 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2022-02-16 | House | First Reading |
2022-02-16 | House | Chief House Sponsor Rep. Terra Costa Howard |
2022-02-16 | House | Arrived in House |
2022-02-16 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Dale Fowler |
2022-02-16 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 054-000-000 |
2022-02-10 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Karina Villa |
2022-02-10 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading February 15, 2022 |
2022-02-10 | Senate | Second Reading |
2022-02-09 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading February 10, 2022 |
2022-02-09 | Senate | Do Pass Health; 013-000-000 |
2022-02-01 | Senate | Assigned to Health |
2022-01-21 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2022-01-21 | Senate | First Reading |
2022-01-21 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Julie A. Morrison |