IL SB3648 | 2009-2010 | 96th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on July 22 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-07-22 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 96-1214
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on July 22 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-07-22 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 96-1214
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Illinois Income Tax Act. Creates a deduction in an amount equal to any amount awarded to the taxpayer during the taxable year by the Court of Claims for time unjustly served in a State prison. Effective immediately.
Title
INC TAX-WRONGFULLY IMPRISONED
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2010-04-28 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 101 N: 10 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-03-17 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 53 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-03-17 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 53 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-07-22 | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 96-1214 | |
2010-07-22 | Effective Date July 22, 2010 | |
2010-07-22 | Governor Approved | |
2010-05-27 | Sent to the Governor | |
2010-04-28 | Passed Both Houses | |
2010-04-28 | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 101-010-000 | |
2010-04-23 | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate | |
2010-04-23 | Second Reading - Short Debate | |
2010-04-22 | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate | |
2010-04-22 | Do Pass / Short Debate Revenue & Finance Committee; 009-000-000 | |
2010-04-22 | Remains in Revenue & Finance Committee | |
2010-04-22 | Recommends Do Pass Subcommittee/ Revenue & Finance Committee; 003-000-000 | |
2010-04-08 | Assigned to Revenue & Finance Committee | |
2010-03-26 | Referred to Rules Committee | |
2010-03-26 | First Reading | |
2010-03-26 | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading | |
2010-03-26 | Chief House Sponsor Rep. Constance A. Howard | |
2010-03-18 | Arrived in House | |
2010-03-17 | Third Reading - Passed; 053-000-000 | |
2010-03-17 | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Heather Steans | |
2010-03-17 | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Donne E. Trotter | |
2010-03-11 | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading March 12, 2010 | |
2010-03-11 | Second Reading | |
2010-03-03 | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 4, 2010 | |
2010-03-03 | Do Pass Judiciary; 008-000-000 | |
2010-02-24 | Assigned to Judiciary | |
2010-02-11 | Referred to Assignments | |
2010-02-11 | First Reading | |
2010-02-11 | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Rickey R. Hendon |