IL SB3498 | 2021-2022 | 102nd General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-2)
Status: Passed on May 13 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-13 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 102-0844
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-2)
Status: Passed on May 13 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-13 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 102-0844
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Vital Records Act. Provides that "certifying health care professional" includes a physician assistant. Defines "physician assistant". Provides that in the absence of a certifying health care professional or with his or her approval, a medical certification may be completed and signed by a physician assistant.
Title
RECORDS-PHYSICIAN ASSISTANT
Sponsors
Sen. Laura Murphy [D] | Sen. John Connor [D] | Sen. Doris Turner [D] | Rep. Randy Frese [R] |
Rep. Kathleen Willis [D] | Rep. Dan Brady [R] | Rep. Camille Lilly [D] |
Roll Calls
2022-03-31 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 112 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-02-16 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 55 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-16 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 55 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-13 | Senate | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 102-0844 |
2022-05-13 | Senate | Effective Date January 1, 2023 |
2022-05-13 | Senate | Governor Approved |
2022-04-29 | Senate | Sent to the Governor |
2022-03-31 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Camille Y. Lilly |
2022-03-31 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Dan Brady |
2022-03-31 | Senate | Passed Both Houses |
2022-03-31 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 112-000-000 |
2022-03-24 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Kathleen Willis |
2022-03-23 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2022-03-23 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2022-03-16 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2022-03-16 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Health Care Licenses Committee; 008-000-000 |
2022-03-07 | House | Assigned to Health Care Licenses Committee |
2022-02-17 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2022-02-17 | House | First Reading |
2022-02-17 | House | Chief House Sponsor Rep. Randy E. Frese |
2022-02-16 | House | Arrived in House |
2022-02-16 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 055-000-000 |
2022-02-15 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading February 16, 2022 |
2022-02-15 | Senate | Second Reading |
2022-02-10 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading February 15, 2022 |
2022-02-10 | Senate | Do Pass Licensed Activities; 008-000-000 |
2022-02-01 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Doris Turner |
2022-01-28 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. John Connor |
2022-01-26 | Senate | Assigned to Licensed Activities |
2022-01-19 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2022-01-19 | Senate | First Reading |
2022-01-19 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Laura M. Murphy |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
410 | 535 | 1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
410 | 535 | 18 | Amended Code | Citation Text |