IL SB3479 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Failed on January 13 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-01-13 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Failed on January 13 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-01-13 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Creates the Reporting of Deaths in Custody Act. Provides that in any case in which a person dies while in the custody of: (1) any law enforcement agency, (2) a local or State correctional facility in the State, or (3) a peace officer or as a result of the peace officer's use of force, the law enforcement agency shall investigate and report the death in writing to the Attorney General, no later than 30 days after the date on which the person in custody or incarcerated died. Provides information that must be contained in the report. Provides that the report shall be a public record under the Freedom of Information Act. Provides that the Attorney General shall issue a public annual report tabulating and evaluating trends and information on deaths in custody. Provides that the family, next of kin, or any other person reasonably nominated by the decedent as an emergency contact shall be notified as soon as possible in a suitable manner giving an accurate factual account of the cause of death and circumstances surrounding the death in custody. Amends the Illinois Identification Card Act and the Unified Code of Corrections concerning reports the Secretary of State, Department of Juvenile Justice, and the Department of Corrections shall make to the General Assembly. Provides that the Secretary of State, Department of Juvenile Justice, and the Department of Corrections shall publish the reports on their respective websites.
Title
REPORTING PRISONER DEATHS
Sponsors
Sen. Jacqueline Collins [D] | Sen. Iris Martinez [D] | Sen. Patricia Van Pelt [D] | Sen. Mattie Hunter [D] |
Sen. Scott Bennett [D] | Sen. Robert Peters [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-01-13 | Senate | Session Sine Die |
2020-04-12 | Senate | Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments |
2020-03-04 | Senate | Postponed - Criminal Law |
2020-02-25 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Mattie Hunter |
2020-02-25 | Senate | Assigned to Criminal Law |
2020-02-20 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Patricia Van Pelt |
2020-02-19 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Robert Peters |
2020-02-19 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Iris Y. Martinez |
2020-02-18 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Scott M. Bennett |
2020-02-14 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2020-02-14 | Senate | First Reading |
2020-02-14 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Jacqueline Y. Collins |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
15 | 335 | 4 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
730 | 5 | 3-14-1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
730 | 5 | 3-2.5-75 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=3479&GAID=15&DocTypeID=SB&SessionID=108&GA=101 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/101/SB/10100SB3479.htm |