IL SB3373 | 2011-2012 | 97th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-2)
Status: Passed on August 6 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-08-06 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 97-0901
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-2)
Status: Passed on August 6 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-08-06 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 97-0901
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Illinois Finance Authority Act. Provides that the Comptroller shall order transferred and the Treasurer shall transfer all amounts remaining in the Fire Truck Revolving Loan Fund, the Fire Station Revolving Loan Fund, and the Ambulance Revolving Loan Fund to the Fire and Ambulance Services Revolving Loan Fund. Repeals the Fire Truck Revolving Loan Fund, the Fire Station Revolving Loan Fund, and the Ambulance Revolving Loan Fund. Amends the State Finance Act. Creates the Fire and Ambulance Services Revolving Loan Fund as a special fund in the State treasury. Provides that the Fund shall be used for (i) loans to fire departments and fire protections districts to purchase fire trucks, (ii) loans to fire departments and fire protection districts to construct fire stations, and (iii) loans to fire departments, fire protection districts, and non-profit ambulance services to purchase ambulances. Amends the Fire Investigation Act. Provides that the Fire Prevention Fund shall be used for grants awarded under the Small Fire-fighting and Ambulance Equipment Grant Program. Provides that, each month, $5.50 from each fine deposited into the Fire Prevention Fund shall be transferred to the Fire and Ambulance Services Revolving Loan Fund (now, $1.50 to the Fire Truck Revolving Loan Fund and $4 to the Ambulance Revolving Loan Fund). Amends the Illinois Vehicle Code. Provides that $15 of a fee imposed upon a person who is convicted of, pleads guilty to, or is placed on supervision for a serious traffic violation shall be deposited into the Fire and Ambulance Services Revolving Loan Fund (now, the Fire Truck Revolving Loan Fund). Amends the Unified Code of Corrections. Provides that an additional fine imposed upon a person convicted of arson shall be deposited into the Fire Prevention Fund (now, the Fire Service and Small Equipment Fund).
Title
IFA-FIRE AND AMBULANCE LOANS
Sponsors
Sen. Terry Link [D] | Sen. Emil Jones [D] | Rep. Eddie Jackson [D] | Rep. William Davis [D] |
Rep. Sidney Mathias [R] | Rep. Angelo Saviano [R] | Rep. Patrick Verschoore [D] | Rep. Daniel Beiser [D] |
Rep. Carol Sente [D] |
Roll Calls
2012-05-30 - Senate - Concurrence in Senate (Y: 54 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-05-24 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 117 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-28 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 55 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-05-24 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 117 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-28 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 55 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-08-06 | Senate | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 97-0901 |
2012-08-06 | Senate | Effective Date January 1, 2013 |
2012-08-06 | Senate | Governor Approved |
2012-06-28 | Senate | Sent to the Governor |
2012-05-30 | Senate | Passed Both Houses |
2012-05-30 | Senate | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Senate Concurs 054-000-000 |
2012-05-29 | Senate | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion To Concur Recommended Do Adopt Local Government; 006-000-000 |
2012-05-25 | Senate | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Assignments Referred to Local Government |
2012-05-24 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Carol A. Sente |
2012-05-24 | Senate | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Referred to Assignments |
2012-05-24 | Senate | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Filed with Secretary Sen. Terry Link |
2012-05-24 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of Concurrence House Amendment(s) 1 - May 25, 2012 |
2012-05-24 | Senate | Secretary's Desk - Concurrence House Amendment(s) 1 |
2012-05-24 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 117-000-000 |
2012-05-23 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2012-05-23 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Withdrawn by Rep. Eddie Lee Jackson, Sr. |
2012-05-22 | House | Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate |
2012-05-22 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2012-05-10 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Sidney H. Mathias |
2012-05-03 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Emil Jones, III |
2012-05-02 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommends Be Adopted Rules Committee; 004-000-000 |
2012-05-01 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee |
2012-05-01 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Eddie Lee Jackson, Sr. |
2012-04-26 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2012-04-25 | House | Do Pass as Amended / Short Debate State Government Administration Committee; 018-000-000 |
2012-04-25 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in State Government Administration Committee; by Voice Vote |
2012-04-24 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to State Government Administration Committee |
2012-04-17 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2012-04-17 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Eddie Lee Jackson, Sr. |
2012-04-16 | House | Assigned to State Government Administration Committee |
2012-04-05 | House | Alternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Eddie Lee Jackson, Sr. |
2012-03-30 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Daniel V. Beiser |
2012-03-30 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Patrick J. Verschoore |
2012-03-30 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Angelo Saviano |
2012-03-29 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. William Davis |
2012-03-28 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2012-03-28 | House | First Reading |
2012-03-28 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading |
2012-03-28 | House | Chief House Sponsor Rep. Lou Lang |
2012-03-28 | House | Arrived in House |
2012-03-28 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Tabled Pursuant to Rule 5-4(a) |
2012-03-28 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 055-000-000 |
2012-03-27 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading March 28, 2012 |
2012-03-27 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Adopted; Link |
2012-03-27 | Senate | Second Reading |
2012-03-27 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommend Do Adopt Local Government; 005-000-000 |
2012-03-27 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Postponed - Local Government |
2012-03-26 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Assignments Refers to Local Government |
2012-03-26 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Assignments |
2012-03-26 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Terry Link |
2012-03-22 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Local Government |
2012-03-16 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2012-03-16 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Terry Link |
2012-03-07 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 8, 2012 |
2012-03-07 | Senate | Do Pass Local Government; 009-000-000 |
2012-02-29 | Senate | Postponed - Local Government |
2012-02-23 | Senate | Postponed - Local Government |
2012-02-17 | Senate | Assigned to Local Government |
2012-02-07 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2012-02-07 | Senate | First Reading |
2012-02-07 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Terry Link |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
20 | 3501 | 825-80 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
20 | 3501 | 825-81 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
20 | 3501 | 825-85 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
30 | 105 | 5.598 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
30 | 105 | 5.667 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
30 | 105 | 5.727 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
30 | 105 | 5.811 | New Code | See Bill Text |
30 | 105 | 6z-93 | New Code | See Bill Text |
425 | 25 | 13.1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
625 | 5 | 16-104d | Amended Code | Citation Text |
730 | 5 | 5-9-1.12 | Amended Code | Citation Text |