IL SB3318 | 2015-2016 | 99th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 19 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-05-27 - Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 19 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-05-27 - Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Election Code. Provides that the election officials of McHenry, Champaign, Jackson, Adams, Logan, and McLean Counties may establish vote centers in lieu of precinct polling locations for the 2017 consolidated primary election, the 2017 consolidated election, the 2018 general primary election, and the 2018 general election. Establishes requirements for vote centers. Provides that the locations of the vote centers shall be approved by a majority vote of the county board in accordance with the Open Meetings Act. Provides that the election authorities in the affected counties shall report the General Assembly the rate of voter turnout in the 2017 consolidated primary election, the 2017 consolidated election, the 2018 general primary election, and the 2018 general election, as well as the 2013 and 2015 consolidated elections and 2014 general elections, no later than June 1, 2017. Repeals this provision on January 1, 2018. Effective on January 1, 2017.
Title
VOTE CENTERS-PILOT PROGRAM
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-05-27 | Senate | Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments |
2016-05-13 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee/3rd Reading Deadline Established As May 27, 2016 |
2016-04-22 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee/3rd Reading Deadline Established As May 13, 2016 |
2016-04-08 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As April 22, 2016 |
2016-03-10 | Senate | To Subcommittee on Election Law |
2016-03-08 | Senate | Assigned to Executive |
2016-02-19 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2016-02-19 | Senate | First Reading |
2016-02-19 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Scott M. Bennett |
Code Citations
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=3318&GAID=13&DocTypeID=SB&SessionID=88&GA=99 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/99/SB/09900SB3318.htm |