IL SB3302 | 2009-2010 | 96th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 9 2010 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-06-27 - Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 9 2010 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-06-27 - Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Children's Health Insurance Program Act, Covering ALL KIDS Health Insurance Act, and Illinois Public Aid Code. Provides that beginning on July 1, 2010, the Department of Healthcare and Family Services shall develop incentive programs for dentists who perform dental services on adults and children covered under the respective Acts. Provides that the incentive programs shall include pilot programs in designated shortage areas that increase rates up to 64% of the reimbursement level that the State reimburses dentists for dental services provided to State employees. Provides that the Department shall increase the rate level of dental specialty services that are provided to children to equal that which the State reimburses dentists for dental services provided to State employees for certain services. Provides that the Department shall develop and implement an incentive program that rewards dentists who are enrolled in the program with a bonus for providing services to a higher annual percentage of patients relative to the number of patients to whom the dentist provided services in the previous year. Provides that the bonus payments shall be based and paid on a graduated scale.
Title
INS-PROVIDER INCENTIVES
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-06-27 | Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments | |
2010-03-11 | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading March 12, 2010 | |
2010-03-11 | Second Reading | |
2010-03-08 | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 9, 2010 | |
2010-03-08 | Do Pass Human Services; 006-001-000 | |
2010-02-24 | Assigned to Human Services | |
2010-02-16 | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. William Delgado | |
2010-02-09 | Referred to Assignments | |
2010-02-09 | First Reading | |
2010-02-09 | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Deanna Demuzio |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=3302&GAID=10&DocTypeID=SB&SessionID=76&GA=96 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/96/SB/09600SB3302.htm |