IL SB3256 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-0)
Status: Passed on July 16 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-07-16 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0606
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-0)
Status: Passed on July 16 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-07-16 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0606
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Code of Criminal Procedure of 1963. Provides a person subject to bail under the Code for a Category B offense shall have $30 deducted from his or her monetary bail every day the person is incarcerated. Provides any sum of money deposited by any person to secure his or her release from custody which remains unclaimed by the person entitled to its return for 3 years after the conditions of the bail bond have been performed and the accused has been discharged from all obligations in the cause shall be presumed to be abandoned and subject to disposition under the Revised Uniform Unclaimed Property Act. Eliminates publishing requirements and other provisions concerning unclaimed bail deposits. Effective immediately.
Title
CRIM PRO-UNCLAIMD BAIL DEPOSIT
Sponsors
Sen. Elgie Sims [D] | Sen. Julie Morrison [D] | Sen. Jacqueline Collins [D] | Sen. Omar Aquino [D] |
Sen. Terry Link [D] | Sen. Mattie Hunter [D] | Sen. Antonio Munoz [D] | Rep. Jonathan Carroll [D] |
Sen. John Connor [D] |
Roll Calls
2018-05-31 - Senate - Concurrence in Senate (Y: 40 N: 10 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-30 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 72 N: 44 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-26 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 53 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-30 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 72 N: 44 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-26 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 53 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-07-16 | Senate | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0606 |
2018-07-16 | Senate | Effective Date January 1, 2019 |
2018-07-16 | Senate | Governor Approved |
2018-06-15 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Antonio Muñoz |
2018-06-06 | Senate | Sent to the Governor |
2018-06-04 | Senate | Passed Both Houses |
2018-06-04 | Senate | Motion Withdrawn Sen. Elgie R. Sims, Jr. |
2018-05-31 | Senate | Motion Filed to Reconsider Vote Sen. Elgie R. Sims, Jr. |
2018-05-31 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Mattie Hunter |
2018-05-31 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Omar Aquino |
2018-05-31 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Terry Link |
2018-05-31 | Senate | Senate Concurs |
2018-05-31 | Senate | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Senate Concurs 040-010-000 |
2018-05-31 | Senate | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion To Concur Recommended Do Adopt Executive; 011-002-001 |
2018-05-31 | Senate | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Assignments Referred to Executive |
2018-05-30 | Senate | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Referred to Assignments |
2018-05-30 | Senate | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Filed with Secretary Sen. Elgie R. Sims, Jr. |
2018-05-30 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of Concurrence House Amendment(s) 1 - May 30, 2018 |
2018-05-30 | Senate | Secretary's Desk - Concurrence House Amendment(s) 1 |
2018-05-30 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Jacqueline Y. Collins |
2018-05-30 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Tabled Pursuant to Rule 40 |
2018-05-30 | House | Third Reading - Extended Debate - Passed 072-044-000 |
2018-05-30 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Extended Debate |
2018-05-30 | House | Removed from Short Debate Status |
2018-05-30 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2018-05-30 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted |
2018-05-30 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee |
2018-05-30 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Allen Skillicorn |
2018-05-29 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Julie A. Morrison |
2018-05-29 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommends Be Adopted Judiciary - Criminal Committee; 008-005-000 |
2018-05-29 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Judiciary - Criminal Committee |
2018-05-25 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2018-05-25 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Jonathan Carroll |
2018-05-25 | House | Alternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Jonathan Carroll |
2018-05-25 | House | Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 31, 2018 |
2018-05-23 | House | Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate |
2018-05-23 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2018-05-17 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2018-05-15 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Judiciary - Criminal Committee; 012-000-000 |
2018-05-09 | House | Assigned to Judiciary - Criminal Committee |
2018-05-08 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2018-05-08 | House | First Reading |
2018-05-08 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. John Connor |
2018-05-04 | House | Chief House Sponsor Rep. Arthur Turner |
2018-04-26 | House | Arrived in House |
2018-04-26 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 053-000-000 |
2018-04-10 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 11, 2018 |
2018-04-10 | Senate | Second Reading |
2018-03-14 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading April 10, 2018 |
2018-03-14 | Senate | Do Pass Criminal Law; 009-000-000 |
2018-02-27 | Senate | Assigned to Criminal Law |
2018-02-16 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2018-02-16 | Senate | First Reading |
2018-02-16 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Elgie R. Sims, Jr. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
725 | 5 | 110-14 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
725 | 5 | 110-17 | Amended Code | Citation Text |