IL SB3101 | 2015-2016 | 99th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Introduced on February 19 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-04-22 - Rule 2-10 Committee/3rd Reading Deadline Established As May 13, 2016
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 19 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-04-22 - Rule 2-10 Committee/3rd Reading Deadline Established As May 13, 2016
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the School Code. Makes a technical change in a Section concerning the State Board of Education.
Title
EDUCATION-TECH
Sponsors
Sen. Daniel Biss [D] | Sen. Kimberly Lightford [D] | Sen. Napoleon Harris [D] | Sen. Jacqueline Collins [D] |
Sen. Michael Noland [D] | Sen. William Delgado [D] | Sen. Mattie Hunter [D] | Sen. Martin Sandoval [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-22 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee/3rd Reading Deadline Established As May 13, 2016 |
2016-04-15 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Martin A. Sandoval |
2016-04-14 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Mattie Hunter |
2016-04-13 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Jacqueline Y. Collins |
2016-04-07 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Napoleon Harris, III |
2016-04-06 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. William Delgado |
2016-03-24 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Michael Noland |
2016-03-10 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Kimberly A. Lightford |
2016-02-19 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2016-02-19 | Senate | First Reading |
2016-02-19 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Daniel Biss |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
105 | 5 | 1A-2.1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=3101&GAID=13&DocTypeID=SB&SessionID=88&GA=99 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/99/SB/09900SB3101.htm |