IL SB3058 | 2015-2016 | 99th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on May 5 2016 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-06-30 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 5 2016 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-06-30 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Public Community College Act. Provides that the ICCB Adult Education Fund and the Career and Technical Education Fund are federal funds (instead of special funds) in the State treasury. Effective immediately.
Title
ICCB-FEDERAL
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-05-05 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 56 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-06-30 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2016-05-31 | House | Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) June 30, 2016 |
2016-05-27 | House | Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 31, 2016 |
2016-05-25 | House | Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate |
2016-05-25 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2016-05-25 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2016-05-25 | House | Do Pass as Amended / Short Debate Executive Committee; 007-004-000 |
2016-05-25 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Executive Committee; by Voice Vote |
2016-05-18 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Executive Committee |
2016-05-17 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2016-05-17 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Barbara Flynn Currie |
2016-05-16 | House | Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 27, 2016 |
2016-05-16 | House | Assigned to Executive Committee |
2016-05-10 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2016-05-10 | House | First Reading |
2016-05-06 | House | Chief House Sponsor Rep. Barbara Flynn Currie |
2016-05-06 | House | Arrived in House |
2016-05-05 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 056-000-000 |
2016-04-22 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee/3rd Reading Deadline Established As May 13, 2016 |
2016-04-19 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 20, 2016 |
2016-04-19 | Senate | Second Reading |
2016-03-17 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading April 5, 2016 |
2016-03-17 | Senate | Do Pass State Government and Veterans Affairs; 007-000-000 |
2016-03-08 | Senate | Assigned to State Government and Veterans Affairs |
2016-02-19 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2016-02-19 | Senate | First Reading |
2016-02-19 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Sue Rezin |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
110 | 805 | 2-16.06 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
110 | 805 | 2-16.07 | Amended Code | Citation Text |