IL SB3049 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 20-7)
Status: Passed on August 21 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-08-21 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-1019
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 20-7)
Status: Passed on August 21 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-08-21 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-1019
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Medical Assistance Article of the Illinois Public Aid Code. Requires the Department of Healthcare and Family Services to reimburse psychiatrists, federally qualified health centers as defined in the Social Security Act, clinical psychologists, clinical social workers, advanced practice registered nurses certified in psychiatric and mental health nursing, and mental health professionals and clinicians authorized by Illinois law to provide mental health services to recipients via telehealth (rather than psychiatrists and federally qualified health centers). Requires the Department to reimburse any Medicaid certified eligible facility or provider organization that acts as the location of the patient at the time a telehealth service is rendered, including substance abuse centers licensed by the Department of Human Services' Division of Alcoholism and Substance Abuse.
Title
MEDICAID-TELEHEALTH SERVICES
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-05-25 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 99 N: 7 NV: 2 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2018-05-01 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 10 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-01 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 10 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-08-21 | Senate | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-1019 |
2018-08-21 | Senate | Effective Date January 1, 2019 |
2018-08-21 | Senate | Governor Approved |
2018-06-22 | Senate | Sent to the Governor |
2018-05-29 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Cristina Castro |
2018-05-25 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Patricia R. Bellock |
2018-05-25 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Monica Bristow |
2018-05-25 | Senate | Passed Both Houses |
2018-05-25 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 099-007-000 |
2018-05-25 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Steven A. Andersson |
2018-05-24 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Margo McDermed |
2018-05-23 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2018-05-23 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2018-05-22 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. La Shawn K. Ford |
2018-05-21 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. David A. Welter |
2018-05-21 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Frances Ann Hurley |
2018-05-21 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Martin J. Moylan |
2018-05-21 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Christine Winger |
2018-05-21 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Linda Chapa LaVia |
2018-05-21 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Jaime M. Andrade, Jr. |
2018-05-21 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Robert Martwick |
2018-05-21 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Will Guzzardi |
2018-05-21 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Sonya M. Harper |
2018-05-21 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Litesa E. Wallace |
2018-05-21 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Juliana Stratton |
2018-05-21 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael Halpin |
2018-05-21 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Sara Wojcicki Jimenez |
2018-05-21 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2018-05-18 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Mental Health Committee; 017-000-000 |
2018-05-16 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Stephanie A. Kifowit |
2018-05-08 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Neil Anderson |
2018-05-08 | House | Assigned to Mental Health Committee |
2018-05-08 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2018-05-08 | House | First Reading |
2018-05-02 | House | Chief House Sponsor Rep. Sue Scherer |
2018-05-02 | House | Arrived in House |
2018-05-01 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 049-000-001 |
2018-04-27 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 3, 2018 |
2018-04-25 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Laura M. Murphy |
2018-04-24 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 25, 2018 |
2018-04-24 | Senate | Second Reading |
2018-04-18 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Julie A. Morrison |
2018-04-18 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Michael E. Hastings |
2018-04-17 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Mattie Hunter |
2018-04-11 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading April 12, 2018 |
2018-04-11 | Senate | Do Pass Human Services; 009-000-000 |
2018-03-14 | Senate | Postponed - Human Services |
2018-02-27 | Senate | Postponed - Human Services |
2018-02-21 | Senate | Assigned to Human Services |
2018-02-15 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2018-02-15 | Senate | First Reading |
2018-02-15 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Andy Manar |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
305 | 5 | 5-5.25 | Amended Code | Citation Text |