IL SB2997 | 2021-2022 | 102nd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 5 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-10 - Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 5 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-10 - Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Cook County Forest Preserve District Act. Provides that forest preserve districts can also acquire easements to create certain renewable energy infrastructure. Removes provisions authorizing forest preserves to lease land to veterans' organizations as grounds for convalescing sick veterans and veterans with disabilities, and as a place upon which to construct rehabilitation quarters, or to a county as grounds for a county nursing home or convalescent home. Provides that forest preserve districts shall have power to lease 80 acres of the lands and grounds acquired by it, for a term of not more than 40 years to a county as grounds for certain renewable energy infrastructure. Defines "certain renewable energy infrastructure".
Title
FOREST PRESERVE-SOLAR ENERGY
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-10 | Senate | Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments |
2022-02-09 | Senate | Postponed - Local Government |
2022-01-11 | Senate | Assigned to Local Government |
2022-01-05 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2022-01-05 | Senate | First Reading |
2022-01-05 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Cristina Castro |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
70 | 810 | 2.4 | New Code | See Bill Text |
70 | 810 | 8 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=2997&GAID=16&DocTypeID=SB&SessionID=110&GA=102 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/102/SB/10200SB2997.htm |