IL SB2910 | 2015-2016 | 99th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on July 8 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-07-08 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 99-0539
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on July 8 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-07-08 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 99-0539
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Illinois Noxious Weed Law. Provides that the governing body of each county may (previously was "shall") carry out the duties and responsibilities vested in it under the Act with respect to land under its jurisdiction in accordance with rules prescribed by the Department of Agriculture. Provides that those duties may (previously was "shall") include the establishment, under the general direction of the governing body of each county, of a coordinated program for control and eradication of noxious weeds within the county. Effective immediately.
Title
NOXIOUS WEED LAW
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-05-23 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 112 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-21 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 57 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-21 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 57 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-07-08 | Senate | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 99-0539 |
2016-07-08 | Senate | Effective Date July 8, 2016 |
2016-07-08 | Senate | Governor Approved |
2016-06-21 | Senate | Sent to the Governor |
2016-05-23 | Senate | Passed Both Houses |
2016-05-23 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 112-000-000 |
2016-05-19 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2016-05-19 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2016-05-18 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2016-05-17 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Agriculture & Conservation Committee; 014-000-000 |
2016-05-13 | House | Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 27, 2016 |
2016-05-09 | House | Assigned to Agriculture & Conservation Committee |
2016-04-22 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2016-04-22 | House | First Reading |
2016-04-22 | House | Chief House Sponsor Rep. Terri Bryant |
2016-04-22 | House | Arrived in House |
2016-04-21 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 057-000-000 |
2016-04-21 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading |
2016-04-21 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Adopted; Luechtefeld |
2016-04-21 | Senate | Recalled to Second Reading |
2016-04-21 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommend Do Adopt Agriculture; 008-000-000 |
2016-04-20 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 21, 2016 |
2016-04-20 | Senate | Second Reading |
2016-04-19 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Assignments Refers to Agriculture |
2016-04-15 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Assignments |
2016-04-15 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Secretary by Sen. David S. Luechtefeld |
2016-04-07 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading April 12, 2016 |
2016-04-07 | Senate | Do Pass as Amended Agriculture; 008-000-000 |
2016-04-07 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted |
2016-04-05 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Agriculture |
2016-04-01 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2016-04-01 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. David S. Luechtefeld |
2016-03-02 | Senate | Assigned to Agriculture |
2016-02-18 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2016-02-18 | Senate | First Reading |
2016-02-18 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. David S. Luechtefeld |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
505 | 100 | 7 | Amended Code | Citation Text |