IL SB2879 | 2015-2016 | 99th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 17 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-07-31 - Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 17 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-07-31 - Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Adult Protective Services Act. Provides that pending an investigation by the financial institution, the Department on Aging, or law enforcement, if a financial institution reasonably believes that financial exploitation of an eligible adult may have occurred, may have been attempted, or is being attempted, the financial institution may, but is not required to, refuse a transaction requiring the disbursement of funds contained in the account: (i) of the eligible adult; (ii) on which the eligible adult is a beneficiary, including a trust or guardianship account; or (iii) of a person suspected of perpetrating financial exploitation of an eligible adult. Requires a financial institution that refuses to disburse funds to report the incident to the Adult Protective Services Program, local law enforcement, and other specified persons. Provides that a financial institution's refusal to disburse funds shall expire within certain timeframes under certain conditions; and that a court of competent jurisdiction may enter an order extending the refusal by the financial institution to disburse funds. Exempts a financial institution and its employees from criminal, civil, and administrative liability for refusing to disburse funds or disbursing funds if the determination of whether or not to disburse funds was made in good faith.
Title
AGING-FINANCIAL EXPLOITATION
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-07-31 | Senate | Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments |
2016-05-27 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee/3rd Reading Deadline Established As May 31, 2016 |
2016-04-22 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee/3rd Reading Deadline Established As May 13, 2016 |
2016-04-06 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading April 7, 2016 |
2016-04-06 | Senate | Do Pass as Amended Financial Institutions; 007-000-000 |
2016-04-06 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted |
2016-04-05 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Financial Institutions |
2016-04-01 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2016-04-01 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Michael Connelly |
2016-03-09 | Senate | Postponed - Financial Institutions |
2016-03-02 | Senate | Assigned to Financial Institutions |
2016-02-17 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2016-02-17 | Senate | First Reading |
2016-02-17 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Michael Connelly |