IL SB2873 | 2011-2012 | 97th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Failed on January 8 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Failed on January 8 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Unified Code of Corrections. Includes in the committed person's master record file: (1) disciplinary infraction tickets and Administrative Review Board action; (2) criminal history; (3) current and past gang affiliations and ranks; (4) information regarding associations and family relationships; (5) any grievances filed and responses to those grievances; and (6) other information that the Department of Corrections or Department of Juvenile Justice determines is relevant to the secure confinement and rehabilitation of the committed person. Effective immediately.
Title
CD CORR-MASTER FILE
Sponsors
Sen. Tim Bivins [R] | Rep. Jim Sacia [R] |
Roll Calls
2012-03-22 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 53 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-01-08 | Senate | Session Sine Die |
2012-03-23 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2012-03-23 | House | First Reading |
2012-03-23 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading |
2012-03-23 | House | Chief House Sponsor Rep. Jim Sacia |
2012-03-22 | House | Arrived in House |
2012-03-22 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 053-000-000 |
2012-03-01 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading March 6, 2012 |
2012-03-01 | Senate | Second Reading |
2012-02-29 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 1, 2012 |
2012-02-29 | Senate | Do Pass Criminal Law; 008-000-000 |
2012-02-23 | Senate | Postponed - Criminal Law |
2012-02-07 | Senate | Assigned to Criminal Law |
2012-02-01 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2012-02-01 | Senate | First Reading |
2012-02-01 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Tim Bivins |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
730 | 5 | 3-5-1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |