IL SB2847 | 2011-2012 | 97th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 18-0)
Status: Passed on August 6 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-08-06 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 97-0903
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 18-0)
Status: Passed on August 6 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-08-06 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 97-0903
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Equal Pay Act of 2003. Provides that in addition to an individual who is deemed to be an employer, any officers of a corporation or agents of an employer who knowingly permit such employer to violate the provisions of the Act shall be deemed to be the employers of the employees.
Title
EQUAL PAY ACT-LIABILITY
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-05-10 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 114 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-29 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 56 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-29 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 56 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-08-06 | Senate | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 97-0903 |
2012-08-06 | Senate | Effective Date January 1, 2013 |
2012-08-06 | Senate | Governor Approved |
2012-06-08 | Senate | Sent to the Governor |
2012-05-10 | Senate | Passed Both Houses |
2012-05-10 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Kimberly A. Lightford |
2012-05-10 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 114-000-000 |
2012-05-10 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Kenneth Dunkin |
2012-05-10 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Naomi D. Jakobsson |
2012-05-08 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Lawrence M. Walsh, Jr. |
2012-05-02 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2012-05-02 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2012-04-25 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2012-04-25 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Judiciary I - Civil Law Committee; 011-000-000 |
2012-04-24 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Jehan A. Gordon |
2012-04-19 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Fred Crespo |
2012-04-19 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Keith Farnham |
2012-04-19 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Carol A. Sente |
2012-04-16 | House | Assigned to Judiciary I - Civil Law Committee |
2012-04-04 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Daniel Biss |
2012-03-30 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2012-03-30 | House | First Reading |
2012-03-30 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Kimberly du Buclet |
2012-03-30 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Kelly M. Cassidy |
2012-03-30 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Barbara Flynn Currie |
2012-03-30 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading |
2012-03-30 | House | Chief House Sponsor Rep. Robyn Gabel |
2012-03-29 | House | Arrived in House |
2012-03-29 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 056-000-000 |
2012-03-29 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Mattie Hunter |
2012-03-29 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Mike Jacobs |
2012-03-29 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading |
2012-03-29 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Adopted; Steans |
2012-03-29 | Senate | Recalled to Second Reading |
2012-03-29 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommend Do Adopt Executive; 012-000-000 |
2012-03-28 | Senate | Sponsor Removed Sen. Mattie Hunter |
2012-03-28 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Assignments Refers to Executive |
2012-03-28 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Assignments |
2012-03-28 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Heather A. Steans |
2012-03-28 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Iris Y. Martinez |
2012-03-28 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Mattie Hunter |
2012-03-21 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading March 22, 2012 |
2012-03-21 | Senate | Second Reading |
2012-03-08 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 21, 2012 |
2012-03-08 | Senate | Do Pass as Amended Labor; 006-004-000 |
2012-03-07 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted |
2012-03-07 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Toi W. Hutchinson |
2012-03-06 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Labor |
2012-03-01 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2012-03-01 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Heather A. Steans |
2012-03-01 | Senate | Held in Labor |
2012-02-24 | Senate | Held in Labor |
2012-01-31 | Senate | Assigned to Labor |
2012-01-24 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2012-01-24 | Senate | First Reading |
2012-01-24 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Heather A. Steans |