IL SB2744 | 2015-2016 | 99th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 16 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-04-08 - Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 16 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-04-08 - Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Evidence Article of the Code of Civil Procedure. Repeals the Part concerning the admission of medical studies into evidence.
Title
CIV PRO-MEDICAL STUDIES-REPEAL
Sponsors
Sen. Don Harmon [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-08 | Senate | Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments |
2016-03-02 | Senate | Postponed - Judiciary |
2016-02-24 | Senate | Assigned to Judiciary |
2016-02-16 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2016-02-16 | Senate | First Reading |
2016-02-16 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Don Harmon |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
735 | 5 | Art. VIII Pt. 21 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=2744&GAID=13&DocTypeID=SB&SessionID=88&GA=99 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/99/SB/09900SB2744.htm |