IL SB2580 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Failed on January 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-09 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Failed on January 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-09 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Probation and Probation Officers Act. Provides that the appointment of officers to probation or court services departments under the Juvenile Court Act of 1987 and the Pretrial Services Act shall be in accordance with the provisions of the Act (rather than only the Juvenile Court Act of 1987).
Title
PROBATION-PRETRIAL SERVICES
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-03-13 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-09 | Senate | Session Sine Die |
2018-05-31 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2018-05-25 | House | Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 31, 2018 |
2018-05-21 | House | Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate |
2018-05-21 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted |
2018-05-21 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2018-05-17 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommends Be Adopted Rules Committee; 004-000-000 |
2018-05-17 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2018-05-17 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Jonathan Carroll |
2018-05-17 | House | Alternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Jonathan Carroll |
2018-05-09 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2018-05-08 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Judiciary - Criminal Committee; 012-000-000 |
2018-05-02 | House | Assigned to Judiciary - Criminal Committee |
2018-04-23 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2018-04-23 | House | First Reading |
2018-04-23 | House | Chief House Sponsor Rep. Arthur Turner |
2018-03-13 | House | Arrived in House |
2018-03-13 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 048-000-000 |
2018-02-22 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading February 27, 2018 |
2018-02-22 | Senate | Second Reading |
2018-02-21 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading February 22, 2018 |
2018-02-21 | Senate | Do Pass Criminal Law; 008-000-000 |
2018-02-14 | Senate | Assigned to Criminal Law |
2018-02-07 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2018-02-07 | Senate | First Reading |
2018-02-07 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. John G. Mulroe |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
730 | 110 | 13a | Amended Code | Citation Text |