IL SB2559 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Engrossed on February 27 2020 - 50% progression
Action: 2020-02-27 - Referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Adoption Act. Provides that the residence requirement for adoption shall not apply to: an adoption of a child placed by a State-licensed child welfare agency performing adoption services (rather than an adoption of a child placed by an agency); and an adoption of a child born in the State who has resided in the State continuously since birth, or a child who has continuously resided in the State for at least 6 months immediately preceding the commencement of the adoption proceeding. Includes additional information for the affidavit of identification to be given by the biological mother in an adoption proceeding. Provides that, in specified proceedings, in the case of a related adoption where the child sought to be adopted is not a youth in care, the court shall have the discretion to waive the appointment of a guardian ad litem. Provides that the ability for the petitioners to apply for judgment of adoption 6 months after the date of any interim order vesting temporary care, custody, and control of a child in the petitioners does not apply to a judgment for adoption of a related child, an adult, or a child as to whose adoption a State-licensed child welfare agency, or person authorized by law, has the right of authority to consent. Deletes language providing that a judgment for adoption of an adult or a child as to whose adoption an agency or person authorized by law has the right of authority to consent may be entered at any time after service of process and after the return day designated therein. Provides instead that a judgment for adoption of: an adult may be entered at any time after the adult has consented to his or her adoption; or a child as to whose adoption a State-licensed child welfare agency, or person authorized by law, has the right of authority to consent may be entered at any time after placement and completion of investigation. Makes other changes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

ADOPTION-VARIOUS

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-02-27 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-02-27HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2020-02-27HouseFirst Reading
2020-02-27HouseChief House Sponsor Rep. Ann M. Williams
2020-02-27HouseArrived in House
2020-02-27SenateThird Reading - Passed; 050-000-000
2020-02-20SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Dan McConchie
2020-02-20SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading February 25, 2020
2020-02-20SenateSecond Reading
2020-02-18SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading February 19, 2020
2020-02-18SenateDo Pass Judiciary; 009-000-000
2020-02-04SenateAssigned to Judiciary
2020-01-29SenateReferred to Assignments
2020-01-29SenateFirst Reading
2020-01-29SenateFiled with Secretary by Sen. Sara Feigenholtz

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
750501Amended CodeCitation Text
7505011Amended CodeCitation Text
7505013Amended CodeCitation Text
7505014Amended CodeCitation Text
750502Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback