IL SB2558 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on April 24 2018 - 50% progression
Action: 2018-09-04 - Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. William E. Brady
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the State Police Act. Provides that the Director of State Police may also authorize any civilian employee of the Department of State Police who is not a State policeman to be a truck weighing inspector with the power of enforcing a provision of the Illinois Vehicle Code which allows upon application and good cause for the issuing of a special permit authorizing the applicant to operate or move a vehicle or combination of vehicles of a size or weight of vehicle or load exceeding the maximum permitted or otherwise not in conformity with the Illinois Vehicle Code upon any highway under the jurisdiction of the party granting the permit. Amends the Illinois Vehicle Code. Provides that a civilian escort vehicle shall be a vehicle not exceeding a gross vehicle weight rating of 26,000 pounds (rather than a passenger or second division vehicle not exceeding 8,000 pounds) that is designed to afford clear and unobstructed vision to both front and rear. Provides that any person, firm, or corporation convicted of a violation for a permit issued for excess size and weight for the third offense by the same person, firm, or corporation within a period of one year after the date of the first offense, not less than $300 nor more than $500 and the Department of State Police may not issue permits to the person, firm, or corporation convicted of a third offense during a period of one year after the date of conviction or supervision for such third offense, unless the violation is the cause or contributing cause in a motor vehicle accident causing damage to property, injury, or death to a person. Provides that if the violation is the cause or contributing cause in a motor vehicle accident of damage to property, injury, or death to a person, the person, firm, or corporation shall not be issued a permit for 180 days after the date of conviction or supervision for the offense.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

STATE POLICE-TRUCK INSPECTION

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-04-24 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-09-04SenateChief Sponsor Changed to Sen. William E. Brady
2018-04-24HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2018-04-24HouseFirst Reading
2018-04-24HouseChief House Sponsor Rep. Tim Butler
2018-04-24HouseArrived in House
2018-04-24SenateThird Reading - Passed; 052-000-000
2018-04-18SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 19, 2018
2018-04-18SenateSecond Reading
2018-04-11SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading April 12, 2018
2018-04-11SenateDo Pass as Amended Transportation; 011-000-000
2018-04-10SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted
2018-03-14SenatePostponed - Transportation
2018-03-14SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Postponed - Transportation
2018-02-27SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Transportation
2018-02-26SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
2018-02-26SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Karen McConnaughay
2018-02-14SenateAssigned to Transportation
2018-02-14SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Steven M. Landek
2018-02-13SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Tom Rooney
2018-02-13SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Dan McConchie
2018-02-08SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Melinda Bush
2018-02-07SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Julie A. Morrison
2018-02-07SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Martin A. Sandoval
2018-02-07SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Cristina Castro
2018-02-07SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Napoleon Harris, III
2018-02-07SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Tim Bivins
2018-02-07SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Neil Anderson
2018-02-07SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Jil Tracy
2018-02-07SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. John G. Mulroe
2018-02-07SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Kwame Raoul
2018-02-07SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Chris Nybo
2018-02-07SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Linda Holmes
2018-02-06SenateReferred to Assignments
2018-02-06SenateFirst Reading
2018-02-06SenateFiled with Secretary by Sen. Karen McConnaughay

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
20261018Amended CodeCitation Text
625515-102Amended CodeCitation Text
625515-301Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback