IL SB2558 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on January 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-09 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on January 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-09 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the State Police Act. Provides that the Director of State Police may also authorize any civilian employee of the Department of State Police who is not a State policeman to be a truck weighing inspector with the power of enforcing a provision of the Illinois Vehicle Code which allows upon application and good cause for the issuing of a special permit authorizing the applicant to operate or move a vehicle or combination of vehicles of a size or weight of vehicle or load exceeding the maximum permitted or otherwise not in conformity with the Illinois Vehicle Code upon any highway under the jurisdiction of the party granting the permit. Amends the Illinois Vehicle Code. Provides that a civilian escort vehicle shall be a vehicle not exceeding a gross vehicle weight rating of 26,000 pounds (rather than a passenger or second division vehicle not exceeding 8,000 pounds) that is designed to afford clear and unobstructed vision to both front and rear. Provides that any person, firm, or corporation convicted of a violation for a permit issued for excess size and weight for the third offense by the same person, firm, or corporation within a period of one year after the date of the first offense, not less than $300 nor more than $500 and the Department of State Police may not issue permits to the person, firm, or corporation convicted of a third offense during a period of one year after the date of conviction or supervision for such third offense, unless the violation is the cause or contributing cause in a motor vehicle accident causing damage to property, injury, or death to a person. Provides that if the violation is the cause or contributing cause in a motor vehicle accident of damage to property, injury, or death to a person, the person, firm, or corporation shall not be issued a permit for 180 days after the date of conviction or supervision for the offense.
Title
STATE POLICE-TRUCK INSPECTION
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-04-24 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-09 | Senate | Session Sine Die |
2018-09-04 | Senate | Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. William E. Brady |
2018-04-24 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2018-04-24 | House | First Reading |
2018-04-24 | House | Chief House Sponsor Rep. Tim Butler |
2018-04-24 | House | Arrived in House |
2018-04-24 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 052-000-000 |
2018-04-18 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 19, 2018 |
2018-04-18 | Senate | Second Reading |
2018-04-11 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading April 12, 2018 |
2018-04-11 | Senate | Do Pass as Amended Transportation; 011-000-000 |
2018-04-10 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted |
2018-03-14 | Senate | Postponed - Transportation |
2018-03-14 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Postponed - Transportation |
2018-02-27 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Transportation |
2018-02-26 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2018-02-26 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Karen McConnaughay |
2018-02-14 | Senate | Assigned to Transportation |
2018-02-14 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Steven M. Landek |
2018-02-13 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Tom Rooney |
2018-02-13 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Dan McConchie |
2018-02-08 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Melinda Bush |
2018-02-07 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Julie A. Morrison |
2018-02-07 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Martin A. Sandoval |
2018-02-07 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Cristina Castro |
2018-02-07 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Napoleon Harris, III |
2018-02-07 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Tim Bivins |
2018-02-07 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Neil Anderson |
2018-02-07 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Jil Tracy |
2018-02-07 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. John G. Mulroe |
2018-02-07 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Kwame Raoul |
2018-02-07 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Chris Nybo |
2018-02-07 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Linda Holmes |
2018-02-06 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2018-02-06 | Senate | First Reading |
2018-02-06 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Karen McConnaughay |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
20 | 2610 | 18 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
625 | 5 | 15-102 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
625 | 5 | 15-301 | Amended Code | Citation Text |