IL SB2545 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 6 2018 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-05-11 - Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the School Code. Provides that the Open Meetings Act does not apply to meetings of a joint committee formed under certain provisions of the Code. Amends the Illinois Educational Labor Relations Act. Provides that negotiating team strategy sessions are included in an exception to the Open Meetings Act.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

EDUCATION-OPEN MEETINGS

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-05-11SenateRule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
2018-05-08SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 9, 2018
2018-05-08SenateApproved for Consideration Assignments
2018-05-08SenateRule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 11, 2018
2018-05-03SenateRule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
2018-04-27SenateRule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 3, 2018
2018-04-25SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 26, 2018
2018-04-25SenateSecond Reading
2018-02-27SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading February 28, 2018
2018-02-27SenateDo Pass Education; 008-000-000
2018-02-21SenatePostponed - Education
2018-02-14SenateAssigned to Education
2018-02-06SenateReferred to Assignments
2018-02-06SenateFirst Reading
2018-02-06SenateFiled with Secretary by Sen. Andy Manar

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
105524-12Amended CodeCitation Text
105524A-4Amended CodeCitation Text
115518Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback