IL SB2545 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on January 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-09 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on January 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-09 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the School Code. Provides that the Open Meetings Act does not apply to meetings of a joint committee formed under certain provisions of the Code. Amends the Illinois Educational Labor Relations Act. Provides that negotiating team strategy sessions are included in an exception to the Open Meetings Act.
Title
EDUCATION-OPEN MEETINGS
Sponsors
Sen. Andy Manar [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-09 | Senate | Session Sine Die |
2018-05-11 | Senate | Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments |
2018-05-08 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 9, 2018 |
2018-05-08 | Senate | Approved for Consideration Assignments |
2018-05-08 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 11, 2018 |
2018-05-03 | Senate | Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments |
2018-04-27 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 3, 2018 |
2018-04-25 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 26, 2018 |
2018-04-25 | Senate | Second Reading |
2018-02-27 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading February 28, 2018 |
2018-02-27 | Senate | Do Pass Education; 008-000-000 |
2018-02-21 | Senate | Postponed - Education |
2018-02-14 | Senate | Assigned to Education |
2018-02-06 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2018-02-06 | Senate | First Reading |
2018-02-06 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Andy Manar |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
105 | 5 | 24-12 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
105 | 5 | 24A-4 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
115 | 5 | 18 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=2545&GAID=14&DocTypeID=SB&SessionID=91&GA=100 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/SB/10000SB2545.htm |