IL SB2530 | 2009-2010 | 96th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 15 2010 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-12-21 - Assigned to Executive Committee
Pending: House Executive Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 15 2010 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-12-21 - Assigned to Executive Committee
Pending: House Executive Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Illinois Municipal Code. Authorizes a municipality to opt out of a police district by an affirmative vote of a majority of the members of the municipality's corporate authority. Provides that a municipality that opts out of a police district may later opt in to the district by an affirmative vote of a majority of the members of the corporate authority. Effective immediately.
Title
MUNI CD-DISSOLVE POLICE DIST
Sponsors
Sen. Gary Forby [D] |
Roll Calls
2010-03-15 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 42 N: 0 NV: 17 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-12-21 | Assigned to Executive Committee | |
2010-12-21 | Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) January 11, 2011 | |
2010-05-28 | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee | |
2010-05-07 | Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 28, 2010 | |
2010-04-30 | Committee/Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 8, 2010 | |
2010-04-27 | Alternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Rep. John E. Bradley | |
2010-04-22 | Assigned to Judiciary II - Criminal Law Committee | |
2010-04-22 | Committee Deadline Extended-Rule 9(b) April 30, 2010 | |
2010-04-22 | Referred to Rules Committee | |
2010-04-22 | First Reading | |
2010-04-22 | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading | |
2010-04-22 | Chief House Sponsor Rep. Careen M. Gordon | |
2010-03-16 | Arrived in House | |
2010-03-15 | Third Reading - Passed; 042-000-000 | |
2010-03-12 | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading March 15, 2010 | |
2010-03-12 | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Adopted; Forby | |
2010-03-12 | Recalled to Second Reading | |
2010-03-11 | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommend Do Adopt Local Government; 008-000-000 | |
2010-03-11 | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Assignments Refers to Local Government | |
2010-03-11 | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading March 12, 2010 | |
2010-03-11 | Second Reading | |
2010-03-10 | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Assignments | |
2010-03-10 | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Gary Forby | |
2010-03-04 | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 9, 2010 | |
2010-03-04 | Do Pass as Amended Local Government; 008-000-000 | |
2010-03-03 | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted | |
2010-03-02 | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Local Government | |
2010-02-24 | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments | |
2010-02-24 | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Gary Forby | |
2010-02-24 | Postponed - Local Government | |
2010-02-17 | Postponed - Local Government | |
2010-02-10 | Held in Local Government | |
2010-02-04 | Assigned to Local Government | |
2010-01-12 | Referred to Assignments | |
2010-01-12 | First Reading | |
2010-01-12 | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Gary Forby |